Longoria et al v. Whitefeather Ventures LLC et al

Plaintiff: Rhian Sugden, Rachel Bernstein Koren, Camila Davalos, Hillary Hepner, Carmen Electra, Jaime Edmondson Longoria, Sabella Shake, Mariana Davalos and Lucy Pinder
Defendant: Unknown Parties and Whitefeather Ventures LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00394
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jennifer G Zipps
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2018 10 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Whitefeather Ventures LLC. (Enos, Christopher)
September 27, 2018 9 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Jaime Edmondson Longoria. (Traulsen, Richard)
September 26, 2018 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Whitefeather Ventures LLC. (Enos, Christopher)
September 21, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Brian Bush on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 20, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Raymond Boucher on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 4, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER that a Case Management Conference is set for Tuesday, October 16, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. at the Evo A. DeConcini Courthouse, 405 W. Congress St., Tucson, AZ 85701, in Courtroom 5B before the Honorable Jennifer G. Zipps. Counsel shall file with the Court, on or before October 9, 2018, a Joint Report reflecting the results of their meeting and outlining the discovery plan. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 8/31/2018. (see Order for complete details) (SIB)
August 28, 2018 6 Answer of Defendant ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Whitefeather Ventures LLC.(Enos, Christopher)
August 13, 2018 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SIB)
August 13, 2018 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (SIB)
August 10, 2018 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15832467. This case has been assigned to the Honorable. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 18-394-TUC-JGZ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SIB)
August 10, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Whitefeather Ventures LLC. (Vandewerker, Cody) (SIB)
August 10, 2018 ***STATE RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Complaint, Summons and Rule 102(a) Fastar Certificate upon Whitefeather Ventures LLC on 7/5/2018. (SIB) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
August 10, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number 20182559. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15832467 filed by Whitefeather Ventures LLC. (Vandewerker, Cody) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(SIB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longoria et al v. Whitefeather Ventures LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhian Sugden
Represented By: Richard Phillip Traulsen
Represented By: Brian M Bush
Represented By: Raymond P Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Bernstein Koren
Represented By: Richard Phillip Traulsen
Represented By: Brian M Bush
Represented By: Raymond P Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camila Davalos
Represented By: Richard Phillip Traulsen
Represented By: Brian M Bush
Represented By: Raymond P Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hillary Hepner
Represented By: Richard Phillip Traulsen
Represented By: Brian M Bush
Represented By: Raymond P Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Electra
Represented By: Richard Phillip Traulsen
Represented By: Brian M Bush
Represented By: Raymond P Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Edmondson Longoria
Represented By: Richard Phillip Traulsen
Represented By: Brian M Bush
Represented By: Raymond P Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabella Shake
Represented By: Richard Phillip Traulsen
Represented By: Brian M Bush
Represented By: Raymond P Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariana Davalos
Represented By: Richard Phillip Traulsen
Represented By: Brian M Bush
Represented By: Raymond P Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Pinder
Represented By: Richard Phillip Traulsen
Represented By: Brian M Bush
Represented By: Raymond P Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitefeather Ventures LLC
Represented By: Ali J Farhang
Represented By: Adam Thomas Peterson
Represented By: Cody Douglas Vandewerker
Represented By: Christopher Lawrence Enos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?