Center for Biological Diversity v. United States Forest Service
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Case Number: 4:2018cv00402
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Leslie A Bowman
Referring Judge: Jennifer G Zipps
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER pursuant to #11 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint; It is Ordered that Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before 10/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 10/4/2018. (MFR)
September 22, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by United States Forest Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ambri, Michael)
September 10, 2018 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Center for Biological Diversity: Proof of Service re: Scheduling Order (FOIA) upon United States Forest Service, U.S. Attorney for District of Arizona; Attorney General of the United States, Jeff Sessions on September 10, 2018. (Melton, Allison)
September 7, 2018 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Center for Biological Diversity: Proof of Service re: Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Text Entry Only Granting Pro Hac Vice Status; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Non-Executed Summons; Executed Summons; and Notice of Availability of Magistrate upon United States Forest Service, U.S. Attorney for District of Arizona; Attorney General of the United States, Jeff Sessions on U.S. Forest Service on Aug. 23, 2018; Attorney General of the U.S., Jeff Sessions on Aug. 23, 2018; and U.S. Attorney Office for District of Arizona on Aug. 20, 2018. (Melton, Allison)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER(FOIA): IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall serve an answer or otherwise plead within 30 days after service, unless the Court otherwise directs for good cause shown. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is 6 months from the date the case is filed. Failure to file such a motion shall result in dismissal for lack of prosecution. Plaintiff shall serve Defendant with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 9/6/18.(BAC)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the order of 8/17/2018 by Judge Zipps, Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman was randomly referred to the above listed case. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV 18-402-TUC-JGZ(LAB). This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAR)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Ordered that this case shall be referred by the Clerk of the Court to a Magistrate Judge by automated random selection for all pretrial proceedings and report and recommendation in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and LRCiv. 72.1 and 72.2, Rules of Practice of the U. S. District Court for the District of Arizona. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 8/17/2018. (BAR)
August 15, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Allison N Melton on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States Forest Service. (MFR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15844043. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jennifer G Zipps. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-00402-TUC-JGZ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Center for Biological Diversity. (Melton, Allison) (MFR)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Biological Diversity. (Melton, Allison) (MFR)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15844043 filed by Center for Biological Diversity. (Melton, Allison) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity v. United States Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Michael Alexander Ambri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Allison N Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?