Karam v. United States Department of Health and Human Services
Plaintiff: Rose Ann Karam
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 4:2018cv00454
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Bernardo P Velasco
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Rose Ann Karam: Certificate of Mailing upon Civil Process Clerk - United States Attorney's Office, District of Arizona on 10/22/2018. (KEP)
November 7, 2018 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Rose Ann Karam: Certificate of Mailing upon Attorney General of the United States on 10/23/2018. (KEP)
November 7, 2018 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Rose Ann Karam: Certificate of Mailing upon U.S. Department of Health and Human Services on 10/22/2018. (KEP)
October 15, 2018 Summons Issued in person at Customer Service Intake Counter as to United States Department of Health and Human Services. (ARC). This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
September 27, 2018 Filing 12 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER the application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefore is GRANTED. (Doc. #2 ). Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Electronic Filing is GRANTED. (Doc. #4 ). The party is required to complete the Electronic Case File Registration form to register as a user with the Clerk's Office and to register as a subscriber to PACER (Public Access to Electronic Records) within five (5) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff's Motion to Include CD of Telephone Call is DENIED without prejudice. (Doc. #3 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco on 9/14/2018. (KEP)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER (FOIA): Defendant shall serve an answer or otherwise plead within thirty (30) days after service, unless the Court otherwise directs for good cause shown. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is six (6) months from the date the case is filed. Failure to file such a motion shall result in dismissal for lack of prosecution. Plaintiff shall serve Defendant with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco on 9/13/2018. (KEP)
September 12, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: The Court's Notice #7 subjecting this case to the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) program is VACATED. This case will not be subject to the MIDP Pilot program requirements. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
September 12, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (MFR)
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Bernardo P Velasco. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-0454-TUC-BPV. Magistrate Election form attached. (MFR)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Rose Ann Karam. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MFR)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Include CD of Telephone Call by Rose Ann Karam. (MFR)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Rose Ann Karam. (MFR)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Rose Ann Karam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karam v. United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Ann Karam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?