Wilson v. Maricopa County Community College District Governing Board et al

Plaintiff: Robert J Wilson
Defendant: Maria Harper-Marinick, Maricopa County Community College District, Kate Smith and Maricopa County Community College District Governing Board
Case Number: 4:2019cv00068
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Soto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : I, II, III, V and VI of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Maria Harper-Marinick, Maricopa County Community College District, Maricopa County Community College District Governing Board, Kate Smith. (Patel, Ravi)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Maria Harper-Marinick, Maricopa County Community College District, Maricopa County Community College District Governing Board, Kate Smith filed by Robert J Wilson.(MCO)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Counts I, II, III and V filed by Maria Harper-Marinick, Maricopa County Community College District, Maricopa County Community College District Governing Board, Kate Smith. (Patel, Ravi)
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Robert J Wilson. (5 pages) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(BAR)
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE in Opposition re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Counts I, II, III and V filed by Robert J Wilson. (MCO)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Maria Harper-Marinick, Maricopa County Community College District, Maricopa County Community College District Governing Board, Kate Smith filed by Robert J Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MCO)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Counts I, II, III and V by Maria Harper-Marinick, Maricopa County Community College District, Maricopa County Community College District Governing Board, Kate Smith. (Patel, Ravi)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Robert J Wilson. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (MCO)
February 8, 2019 Summons Issued in person at Customer Service Intake Counter as to Maria Harper-Marinick, Maricopa County Community College District, Kate Smith. (ARC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (ARC)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number TUC029869. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Soto. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-68-TUC-JAS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number TUC029869 filed by Robert J Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Maricopa County Community College District Governing Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Harper-Marinick
Represented By: Ravi Vasishta Patel
Represented By: Gordon Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Community College District
Represented By: Ravi Vasishta Patel
Represented By: Gordon Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Smith
Represented By: Ravi Vasishta Patel
Represented By: Gordon Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Community College District Governing Board
Represented By: Ravi Vasishta Patel
Represented By: Gordon Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?