Trinidad v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Gerardo Romero Trinidad
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv00090
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Lynnette C Kimmins
Referring Judge: Bernardo P Velasco
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Carol Clark appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Clark, Carol)
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 Remark: The Magistrate Judge presiding in this case is directly reassigned by the Clerk to Magistrate Judge Lynnette C. Kimmins. All future filings shall reflect the following case number CV-19-90-TUC-LCK. All hearings currently scheduled in this case before Magistrate Judge Velasco, will proceed as scheduled before Judge Kimmins. Hearings not yet scheduled, shall be scheduled before the newly assigned Magistrate Judge.This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ADI-MLH, )
March 11, 2019 NOTICE of request for e-notices by J. Cole Hernandez. (Hernandez, J)
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gerardo Romero Trinidad: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Matthew G Whitaker, Acting US Attorney General (03/07/19); Nancy A. Berryhill, Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (03/04/19); Elizabeth Strange, First Assistant US Attorney for the District of Arizona (03/05/19) on 03/07/19; 03/04/19; 03/05/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Domestic return receipts and certified mail receipts)(Caldwell, Mark)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, the Assistant United States Attorney for the District of Arizona and the United States Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MYE, ). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco on 2/22/2019. (BAR)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Ordered that the parties must fully comply with the following deadlines and procedures re Briefing Requirements Contained in LRCiv 16.1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco on 2/22/2019. (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.)(BAR)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Bernardo P Velasco. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-90-TUC-BPV. Magistrate Election form attached. (ARC)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Gerardo Romero Trinidad. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ARC)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Gerardo Romero Trinidad. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ARC)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Gerardo Romero Trinidad. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trinidad v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Romero Trinidad
Represented By: Mark Ross Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Carol Sue Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?