Gerrodette v. United States Department of the Interior et al

Plaintiff: Patricia Gerrodette
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management and United States Department of the Interior
Case Number: 4:2019cv00113
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Rosemary Marquez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior.(Hernandez, J)
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Patricia Gerrodette: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Supplemental Documents upon All Defendants on 3/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hardee, Alex)
March 6, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Alex Hardee and Heidi McIntosh on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER (FOIA): IT IS ORDERED that defendant shall serve an answer or otherwise plead within 30 days after service, unless the Court otherwise directs for good cause shown. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for filing dispositive motions is 6 months from the date the case is filed. Failure to file such a motion shall result in dismissal for lack of prosecution. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve Defendant with a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 3/6/19.(BAC)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16603363. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Rosemary Marquez. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-113-TUC-RM. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Patricia Gerrodette. (Hardee, Alex) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(ARC)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16603363 filed by Patricia Gerrodette. (Hardee, Alex) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Corporate Disclosure)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerrodette v. United States Department of the Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Gerrodette
Represented By: Heidi J McIntosh
Represented By: Alex Jacob Hardee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: J Cole Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: J Cole Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?