Schneider v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Stacey Schneider
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv00147
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Bruce G Macdonald
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Certified Copy of Administrative Transcript re: #14 Answer to Complaint filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Transcript, #3 Administrative, #4 Payment, #5 Jurisdiction, #6 Non-Disability, #7 Disability, #8 Med Rec 1, #9 Med Rec 2, #10 Med Rec 3, #11 Med Rec 4, #12 Med Rec 5)(McAdam, S)
June 4, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(McAdam, S)
April 10, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
April 10, 2019 Filing 12 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
April 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Wyeth McAdam appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (McAdam, S)
April 5, 2019 NOTICE of request for e-notices by J. Cole Hernandez. (Hernandez, J)
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (MYE, ). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Within sixty (60) days from the filing of the answer and record, Plaintiff shall file an opening brief in the form prescribed by LRCiv. 16.1. Within thirty (30) days after service of Plaintiff's opening brief, Defendant must file an answering brief. Plaintiff may file a reply brief within fifteen (15) days after service of Defendant's brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 4/1/2019. (See attached Order for complete information)(DLC)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 4/1/2019. (See attached Order for complete information) (DLC)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Bruce G Macdonald. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-147-TUC-BGM. Magistrate Election form attached. (ARC)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Stacey Schneider. (Miller, Audrey) (ARC)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Stacey Schneider. (Miller, Audrey) (Attachments: #1 IFP2)(ARC)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Stacey Schneider.(Miller, Audrey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schneider v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Schneider
Represented By: Audrey Corinne Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: S Wyeth McAdam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?