Crump v. Fiat Chrysler Automobiles NV et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Crump
Defendant: FCA US LLC and Fiat Chrysler Automobiles NV
Case Number: 4:2019cv00194
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline M Rateau
Nature of Suit: Contract: Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Elizabeth Crump. (Cappio, Gretchen)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Election Form Deadline sent to all parties on this date. (BAC)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. FCA US LLC answer due 5/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau on 4/30/2019. (BAR)
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 *MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by FCA US LLC. (Collins, Peter) *Modified to correct motion type on 5/1/2019 (KEP).
April 26, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Lynn Sarko on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 25, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Ryan McDevitt, Gretchen Cappio and Rachel Morowitz on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Elizabeth Crump: Declaration of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon FCA US LLC on 4/11/2019. (Kilgard, Ron)
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAR)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC, Fiat Chrysler Automobiles NV. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16720608. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jacqueline M Rateau. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 19-00194-TUC-JR. Magistrate Election form attached. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAR)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Elizabeth Crump. (Kilgard, Ron) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAR)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16720608 filed by Elizabeth Crump. (Kilgard, Ron) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crump v. Fiat Chrysler Automobiles NV et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Peter Collins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiat Chrysler Automobiles NV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Crump
Represented By: Ryan McDevitt
Represented By: Alison E Chase
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: Ron Kilgard
Represented By: Rachel E Morowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?