Decker v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Julie Ann Decker
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv00195
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Eric J Markovich
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Certified Copy of Administrative Transcript re: #15 Answer to Complaint filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Transcript, #3 Administrative, #4 Payment, #5 Jurisdiction, #6 Non-Disability, #7 Disability, #8 Med Rec 1, #9 Med Rec 2, #10 Med Rec 3, #11 Med Rec 4, #12 Med Rec 5, #13 Med Rec 6, #14 Med Rec 7, #15 Med Rec 8, #16 Med Rec 9)(Cheung, Allison)
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Cheung, Allison)
April 12, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Julie Ann Decker: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Matthew G Whitaker, Acting US Attorney General (04/10/19); Nancy A. Berryhill, Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (04/08/19); Elizabeth Strange, First Assistant US Attorney for the District of Arizona (04/05/19) on 04/10/19; 04/08/19; 04/05/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Domestic return receipts and certified mail receipts)(Caldwell, Mark)
April 10, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
April 10, 2019 Filing 13 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
April 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Allison Cheung appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Cheung, Allison)
April 5, 2019 NOTICE of request for e-notices by J. Cole Hernandez. (Hernandez, J)
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(KEP)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefore. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich on 4/2/2019. (KEP)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties must fully comply with the following deadlines and procedures, re Briefing Requirements Contained in LRCiv 16.1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich on 3/29/2019. (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS)(ARC)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eric J Markovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-00195-TUC-EJM. Magistrate Election form attached. (BAC)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Julie Ann Decker. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAC)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Julie Ann Decker.(Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(BAC)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Julie Ann Decker. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Decker v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Ann Decker
Represented By: Mark Ross Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Allison Jaime Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?