Thomas v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Mack Thomas
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv00196
Filed: March 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Leslie A Bowman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Certified Copy of Administrative Transcript filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 certification, #2 transcript, #3 administrative, #4 payment, #5 jurisdictional, #6 non disability, #7 disability, #8 med recs)(Tomaselli, Gina)
July 4, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Tomaselli, Gina)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: Within 60 days from the filing of the answer and record, Plaintiff shall file an opening brief in the form prescribed by LRCiv 16.1. Within 30 days after service of Plaintiffs opening brief, Defendant must file an answering brief. Plaintiff may file a reply brief within 15 days after service of Defendants brief. Failure to timely file the required opening brief may subject this case to dismissal as prescribed in LRCiv 41.1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 6/28/2019. (BAR)
May 13, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
May 13, 2019 Filing 11 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gina Tomaselli appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Tomaselli, Gina)
May 8, 2019 NOTICE of request for e-notices by J. Cole Hernandez. (Hernandez, J)
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service of the summons and complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 4/30/2019. (ARC)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
March 31, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Leslie A Bowman. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-00196-TUC-LAB. Magistrate Election form attached. (KAH)
March 31, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Mack Thomas. (Miller, Audrey) (KAH)
March 31, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Mack Thomas. (Miller, Audrey) (Attachments: #1 IFP) (KAH)
March 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mack Thomas. (Miller, Audrey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mack Thomas
Represented By: Audrey Corinne Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Gina Tomaselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?