Planned Parenthood Arizona Incorporated et al v. Brnovich et al
Plaintiff: Paul A Isaacson, Planned Parenthood Arizona Incorporated, Deanna Wright and William Richardson
Defendant: Jodi A Bain, Bruce Bethancourt, Elizabeth Boyer, Theresa Berrigan, Gary R Figge, Melinda Pheanis Preston, Cecelia Andersen, Laura Dorrell, David Beyer, Cara M Christ, Lisa Smith, Carmen Hill-Mekoba, Lajuana Gillette, James M Gillard, Lois Krahn, Jana Machesky, Patricia McSorley, Joey Ridenour, Teresa L Connolly, Mark Brnovich, Lori A Gutierrez, R Screven Farmer, Edward G Paul, Pamela E Jones and Randy C Quinn
Case Number: 4:2019cv00207
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Jennifer G Zipps
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2019 at 01:00 PM before Judge Jennifer G Zipps. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if any counsel wishes to appear telephonically, counsel must notify the Court on or before July 17, 2019, by contacting chambers. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 7/5/2019. (See attached Order for complete details)(DLC)
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiffs Paul A Isaacson, Planned Parenthood Arizona Incorporated, William Richardson, Deanna Wright. (Pasternak, Daniel)
June 24, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cecelia Andersen, Jodi A Bain, Theresa Berrigan, Bruce Bethancourt, David Beyer, Elizabeth Boyer, Mark Brnovich, Cara M Christ, Teresa L Connolly, Laura Dorrell, R Screven Farmer, Gary R Figge, James M Gillard, Lajuana Gillette, Lori A Gutierrez, Carmen Hill-Mekoba, Pamela E Jones, Lois Krahn, Jana Machesky, Patricia McSorley, Edward G Paul, Melinda Pheanis Preston, Randy C Quinn, Joey Ridenour, Lisa Smith.(Pappas, Andrew)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER The Court concludes that this case is not sufficiently similar to Tucson Women's Center to warrant reassignment under LRCiv. 3.7(a)(2). IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' objection is sustained. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 5/2/2019. (DLC)
May 1, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE re: #17 Objection by Defendants Cecelia Andersen, Jodi A Bain, Theresa Berrigan, Bruce Bethancourt, David Beyer, Elizabeth Boyer, Mark Brnovich, Cara M Christ, Teresa L Connolly, Laura Dorrell, R Screven Farmer, Gary R Figge, James M Gillard, Lajuana Gillette, Lori A Gutierrez, Carmen Hill-Mekoba, Pamela E Jones, Lois Krahn, Jana Machesky, Patricia McSorley, Edward G Paul, Melinda Pheanis Preston, Randy C Quinn, Joey Ridenour, Lisa Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pappas, Andrew)
May 1, 2019 Filing 17 OBJECTION re: #16 Notice (Other) of Related Cases by Plaintiffs Paul A Isaacson, Planned Parenthood Arizona Incorporated, William Richardson, Deanna Wright. (Pasternak, Daniel)
April 30, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE re: Related Cases Under LRCiv 3.7(a)(2) by Cecelia Andersen, Jodi A Bain, Theresa Berrigan, Bruce Bethancourt, David Beyer, Elizabeth Boyer, Mark Brnovich, Cara M Christ, Teresa L Connolly, Laura Dorrell, R Screven Farmer, Gary R Figge, James M Gillard, Lajuana Gillette, Lori A Gutierrez, Carmen Hill-Mekoba, Pamela E Jones, Lois Krahn, Jana Machesky, Patricia McSorley, Edward G Paul, Melinda Pheanis Preston, Randy C Quinn, Joey Ridenour, Lisa Smith re: #1 Complaint . (Pappas, Andrew)
April 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin D Ray on behalf of Cara M Christ. (Ray, Kevin)
April 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Oramel Horace Skinner on behalf of Mark Brnovich. (Skinner, Oramel)
April 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by John R Tellier on behalf of John Robert Tellier. (Tellier, John)
April 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew George Pappas on behalf of Mark Brnovich. (Pappas, Andrew)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. In addition, parties shall endeavor not to oppose motions to amend that are filed prior to the Scheduling Conference or within the time set forth in the Rule 16 Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 4/26/2019. (See attached Order for complete details)(DLC)
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Paul A Isaacson, Planned Parenthood Arizona Incorporated, William Richardson, Deanna Wright: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on April 23, 2019 to Joey Ridenour, et al., Arizona State Board of Nursing . (Pasternak, Daniel)
April 26, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Paul A Isaacson, Planned Parenthood Arizona Incorporated, William Richardson, Deanna Wright: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on April 23, 2019 to Patricia McSorely, et al., Arizona Medical Board . (Pasternak, Daniel)
April 26, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Paul A Isaacson, Planned Parenthood Arizona Incorporated, William Richardson, Deanna Wright: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on April 23, 2019 to Cara M. Christ, Director of the Arizona Department of Health Services . (Pasternak, Daniel)
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Paul A Isaacson, Planned Parenthood Arizona Incorporated, William Richardson, Deanna Wright: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on April 23, 2019 to Mark Brnovich, Attorney General of Arizona . (Pasternak, Daniel)
April 15, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Jessica Sklarsky on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 15, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Marc Hearron on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 12, 2019 Amended Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Alice Clapman on behalf of plaintiffs (amended to correct attorney's last name spelling). This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 12, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Alice Chapman on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 11, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Dawn Sestito, Catalina Vergara, Dimitri Portnoi, Brittany Rogers and Heather Welles on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons)(MFR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16772737. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jennifer G Zipps. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-0207-TUC-JGZ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Paul A Isaacson, Planned Parenthood Arizona Incorporated, William Richardson, Deanna Wright. (Pasternak, Daniel) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons)(MFR)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Planned Parenthood Arizona Incorporated. (Pasternak, Daniel) (MFR)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16772737 filed by William Richardson, Planned Parenthood Arizona Incorporated, Deanna Wright, Paul A Isaacson. (Pasternak, Daniel) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Planned Parenthood Arizona Incorporated et al v. Brnovich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodi A Bain
Represented By: John R Tellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Bethancourt
Represented By: John R Tellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Boyer
Represented By: John R Tellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Berrigan
Represented By: John R Tellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary R Figge
Represented By: John R Tellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda Pheanis Preston
Represented By: John R Tellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecelia Andersen
Represented By: John R Tellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Dorrell
Represented By: John R Tellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Beyer
Represented By: John R Tellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cara M Christ
Represented By: Kevin D Ray
Represented By: Aubrey Joy Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Smith
Represented By: John R Tellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Hill-Mekoba
Represented By: John R Tellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lajuana Gillette
Represented By: John R Tellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M Gillard
Represented By: John R Tellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lois Krahn
Represented By: John R Tellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jana Machesky
Represented By: John R Tellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia McSorley
Represented By: John R Tellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey Ridenour
Represented By: John R Tellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa L Connolly
Represented By: John R Tellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Brnovich
Represented By: Andrew George Pappas
Represented By: Oramel Horace Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori A Gutierrez
Represented By: John R Tellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Screven Farmer
Represented By: John R Tellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward G Paul
Represented By: John R Tellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela E Jones
Represented By: John R Tellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy C Quinn
Represented By: John R Tellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul A Isaacson
Represented By: Catalina Vergara
Represented By: Dimitri D Portnoi
Represented By: Dawn Sestito
Represented By: Jessica Sklarsky
Represented By: Marc A Hearron
Represented By: Heather Welles
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Pasternak
Represented By: Brittany Rogers
Represented By: Marc Andrew Hearron
Represented By: Jessica Leah Sklarsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Arizona Incorporated
Represented By: Catalina Vergara
Represented By: Dimitri D Portnoi
Represented By: Dawn Sestito
Represented By: Alice Clapman
Represented By: Heather Welles
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Pasternak
Represented By: Brittany Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Wright
Represented By: Catalina Vergara
Represented By: Dimitri D Portnoi
Represented By: Dawn Sestito
Represented By: Alice Clapman
Represented By: Heather Welles
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Pasternak
Represented By: Brittany Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Richardson
Represented By: Catalina Vergara
Represented By: Dimitri D Portnoi
Represented By: Dawn Sestito
Represented By: Alice Clapman
Represented By: Heather Welles
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Pasternak
Represented By: Brittany Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?