Austin et al v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Margaret Austin, Jill Gershan, Mark Hinterberg, David Hinterberg and Susan Casper
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00238
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Soto
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Smelley, Hutson)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiffs Margaret Austin, Susan Casper, Jill Gershan, David Hinterberg, Mark Hinterberg. (Herz, Joel)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Margaret Austin, Susan Casper, Jill Gershan, David Hinterberg, Mark Hinterberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Herz, Joel)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transamerica Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Commonwealth General Corporation, Other Affiliate AEGON, N.V., Other Affiliate Transamerica Corporation for Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attachment)(Smelley, Hutson)
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Reynolds, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Smelley, Hutson)
May 7, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Thomas Hetherington and Hutson B Smelley on behalf of defendant. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE re: Plaintiffs' Service of Order on Defendant by Margaret Austin, Susan Casper, Jill Gershan, David Hinterberg, Mark Hinterberg . (Herz, Joel)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time.. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 5/3/19.(JAS, kr)
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (First Request) by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNichol, Andrew)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: that after all parties have been served and have answered the Complaint, Plaintiffs shall file a Motion indicating that all defendants have filed answers such that the case is ready to proceed to the next step in the litigation. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants at the same time they serve the Summons and Complaint Signed by Judge James A Soto on 5/2/2019. Review ORDER for details. (MCO)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet re: #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (McNichol, Andrew)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (BAC)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit a Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new removal case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please file a Supplemental Cover Sheet. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16842936. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Soto. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-00238-TUC-JAS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20191469. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-16842936 filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (McNichol, Andrew) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin et al v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Austin
Represented By: Joel Louis Herz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Gershan
Represented By: Joel Louis Herz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hinterberg
Represented By: Joel Louis Herz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hinterberg
Represented By: Joel Louis Herz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Casper
Represented By: Joel Louis Herz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew Lee McNichol
Represented By: Thomas FA Hetherington
Represented By: Hutson B Smelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?