Harris v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Jeffery Harris and Jeffery J Harris
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00248
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Frank R Zapata
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time #8 is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall have until and including July 17, 2019 to file its response to the Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 6/24/2019. (MCO)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Melissa)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Melissa M. Kroeger appearing for United States of America. . (Kroeger, Melissa)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Allow Electronic Filing. The party is required to complete the Electronic Case File Registration form to register as a user with the Clerk's Office and to register as a subscriber to PACER (Public Access to Electronic Records) within five (5) days of the date of this Order. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 5/13/2019. (MCO)
May 2, 2019 Summons Issued in person at Customer Service Intake Counter as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ARC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KAH)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (KAH)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number TUC030341. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Frank R Zapata. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-00248-TUC-FRZ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAH)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Jeffery Harris. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(KAH)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number TUC030341 filed by Jeffery Harris. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Aptness of Expert Opinion Testimony, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Receipt)(KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery J Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Melissa Marcus Kroeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?