Russell v. Nielsen et al

Plaintiff: Chau Bui Russell
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kirstjen M Nielsen, Julie Hashimoto, Lee Francis Cissna, United States Department of Justice, Christopher Wray, Federal Bureau of Investigation and William P Barr
Case Number: 4:2019cv00267
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Maria S Davila
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Chau Bui Russell: Affidavit of Service re: Summons upon Kirstjen Nielsen, William Barr, Julie Hashimoto, Christopher Wray, Lee Francis Cissna on 05/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Ayala, Siovhan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 Magistrate Election Form Deadline resent, number 3.(BAC)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Election Form Deadline resent on this date. (BAC)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to William P Barr, Lee Francis Cissna, Julie Hashimoto, Kirstjen M Nielsen, and Christopher Wray. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(MYE, ). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Submitted by Chau Bui Russell. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Ayala, Siovhan)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 *ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT TO MAIN DOCUMENT Automated Civil Cover Sheet re: #1 Complaint for Naturalization by Chau Bui Russell . (Ayala, Siovhan) *Modified on 5/15/2019 to correct event (DLC).
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #2 Summons Submitted filed by Chau Bui Russell. Unable to issue summonses submitted. Summonses do not match the standard form. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please resubmit summonses on standard form available on the website. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 *NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 COMPLAINT for Naturalization, Declaratory Relief and MANDAMUS filed by Chau Bui Russell. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR) *Modified to clarify docket text on 5/13/2019 (MFR).
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16900187. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Maria S Davila. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-0267-TUC-MSD. Magistrate Election form attached. (MFR)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Chau Bui Russell. (Ayala, Siovhan) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MFR)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 *COMPLAINT for Naturalization, Declaratory Relief and MANDAMUS. Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0970-16900187 filed by Chau Bui Russell. (Ayala, Siovhan) (MFR) *Modified to add additional attachment(s): #1 Civil Cover Sheet; NEF regenerated on 5/13/2019 (MFR)/(SCH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Hashimoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chau Bui Russell
Represented By: Siovhan Sheridan Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?