Getzen v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: David Getzen
Defendant: Unknown Parties, Charles L Ryan, Juli Roberts and Richard L Pratt
Case Number: 4:2019cv00278
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Pro Se (Tucson)
Referring Judge: Cindy K Jorgenson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance - Legal Counsel Advisory by David Getzen. (BAR)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by David Getzen. (4 pages) (Associated Cases: CV-19-241-TUC-CKJ,CV19-265-TUC-CKJ,CV19-278-TUC-CKJ,CV19-281-TUC-CKJ,CV-19-320-TUC-CKJ) (BAR)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by David Getzen. (2 pages) (MCO)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Charles L Ryan, Unknown Parties, Richard L Pratt, Juli Roberts filed by David Getzen. (41 pages) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MCO)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED: Plaintiff's #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is granted. Plaintiff's #5 Motion for an Extension is granted to the extent stated below. Plaintiff's #6 Motion for Extension of Time, #7 Motion for Appointment of Counsel and #8 Motion for Witness Protection are denied. Within 60 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must file a first amended complaint in compliance with the May 20, 2019 Order. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal. Signed by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 6/11/2019. (BAR)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by David Getzen. (9 pages) (ARC)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by David Getzen. (2 pages) (ARC)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Witness Protection by David Getzen. (3 pages) (BAR)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Legal Assistance by David Getzen. (3 pages) (BAR)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time for 60 days to Respond by David Getzen. (2 pages) (BAR)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Extend Time in Good Cause Showing by David Getzen. (4 pages) (BAR)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, that Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this order, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Complaint (Doc. #2 ) is dismissed for failure to comply with Rule 3.4 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to comply within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. Signed by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 5/20/2019. (MCO)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MFR)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by David Getzen. (5 pages) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MFR)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER that Plaintiffs' request that this case proceed as a class action (Doc. 1 ) is denied. This case is severed into individual actions, one for each named Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court must assign a new case number to each new individual action. The Clerk of Court must close this case (CV 19-00265-TUC- CKJ) and enter judgment accordingly. The Clerk of Court must file a copy of the Complaint (Doc. 1 ) and this Order in each new case. The rulings in this Order shall apply in each new case. All further pleadings, motions or other papers submitted for filing by an individual Plaintiff in his separate case must be signed by the individual Plaintiff, or they will be stricken (see attached Order for complete details). Signed by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 5/15/2019. (MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Getzen v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Getzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juli Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?