Gardano v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Peter Gardano and Peter Garduno
Defendant: Unknown Parties and Charles L Ryan
Case Number: 4:2019cv00280
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Pro Se (Tucson)
Referring Judge: Raner C Collins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED Plaintiff's #4 Motion to Stay/Abey is denied. Within 45 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action. Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed for failure to comply with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 3.4. Within 45 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff may file a first amended complaint using the court-approved form complaint for use by prisoners. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 7/2/2019. (BAR)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay/Abey Extension of Time on the Civil Rights Complaint Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 with Good Cause Showing by Peter Gardano. (3 pages) (BAR)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MFR)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Peter Gardano. (5 pages)(MFR)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER that Plaintiffs' request that this case proceed as a class action (Doc. 1 ) is denied. This case is severed into individual actions, one for each named Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court must assign a new case number to each new individual action. The Clerk of Court must close this case (CV 19-00265-TUC- CKJ) and enter judgment accordingly. The Clerk of Court must file a copy of the Complaint (Doc. 1 ) and this Order in each new case. The rulings in this Order shall apply in each new case. All further pleadings, motions or other papers submitted for filing by an individual Plaintiff in his separate case must be signed by the individual Plaintiff, or they will be stricken (see attached Order for complete details). Signed by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 5/15/2019. (MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardano v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Gardano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Garduno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?