Moore et al v. Garnand et al
Plaintiff: ESMJ Partners, Patricia Moore, Southwest Nonprofit Housing Corporation and JC Moore Grandchildren's Trust
Defendant: Rebecca Lopez, Kimberly Frie, Unknown Lopez, Dain Salisbury, Richard Radinsky and Unknown Salisbury
Case Number: 4:2019cv00290
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Leslie A Bowman
Referring Judge: Cindy K Jorgenson
2 Judge: Rosemary Marquez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that this case is referred Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman for all pretrial proceedings and Report and Recommendation. All future filings in this case shall be designated: CV-19-00290-TUC-RM (LAB). Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 7/18/2019. (MFR)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Oral Argument Requested by Greg Moore. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: CV-18-00395-TUC-BGM: CV-19-00290-TUC-LAB) (Moore, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Pace on behalf of Kimberly Frie, Sean Garnand, Rebecca Lopez, Richard Radinsky, Dain Salisbury. (Pace, Sarah)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this Case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge, Rosemary Marquez. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-00290-RM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.(BAC)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Magistrate Election Form Deadline again on this date. (BAC)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Magistrate Election Form Deadline mailed to all plaintiffs on this date. (BAC)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED: This case is reassigned by random lot to the Honorable Leslie A Bowman. Counsel and the parties shall designate all further filings in this case as: CV 19-290-TUC-LAB. Signed by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 6/11/2019. (BAR)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Benjamin Frie, Kimberly Frie, Amy Garnand, Sean Garnand, Holly Radinsky, Richard Radinsky, Dain Salisbury. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(BAR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST re: Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Greg Moore. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Moore, Michael)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16956908. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Cindy K Jorgenson. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-290-TUC-CKJ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16956908 filed by Greg Moore, Patricia Moore, Southwest Nonprofit Housing Corporation, JC Moore Grandchildren's Trust, ESMJ Partners. (Moore, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore et al v. Garnand et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESMJ Partners
Represented By: Michael Garth Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Moore
Represented By: Michael Garth Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwest Nonprofit Housing Corporation
Represented By: Michael Garth Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JC Moore Grandchildren's Trust
Represented By: Michael Garth Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Lopez
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Frie
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dain Salisbury
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Radinsky
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Salisbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?