Valdez v. Penske Truck Leasing Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Maria Valdez
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Corporation and Penske Truck Leasing Corporation LP
Case Number: 4:2019cv00303
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: David C Bury
Referring Judge: Eric J Markovich
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #9 Motion to Temporarily Stay the Litigation is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant to file the Responsive Pleading is extended, one time, to 8/8/19. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR FILING THE RESPONSIVE PLEADING WILL BE GRANTED. Parties shall comply with General Order 17-08, 6 in the event they seek to extend the time for filing the initial MIDP discovery responses. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 7/19/19.(BAC)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay by Maria Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Karnas, Matthew)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this Case is reassigned by random draw to Senior District Judge David C Bury. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-00303-DCB. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.(BAC)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Penske Truck Leasing Corporation. (MYE, ). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint Summons by Plaintiff Maria Valdez. (Karnas, Matthew)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17017123. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eric J Markovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-303-TUC-EJM. Magistrate Election form attached. (DLC)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17017123 filed by Maria Valdez. (Karnas, Matthew) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valdez v. Penske Truck Leasing Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Valdez
Represented By: Matthew David Karnas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Corporation LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?