Mayer v. Brnovich et al
Plaintiff: John Elliott Mayer, Jr.
Defendant: Mark Napier and Mark Brnovich
Case Number: 4:2019cv00338
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: David C Bury
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this action is dismissed. (MCO)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that the Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice (Doc. #12 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, pursuant to the Court's Order issued on July 23, 2019. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 8/14/2019. (MCO)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Case With Prejudice by Mark Napier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to MTD, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to MTD)(Roubicek, Laura)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST re: No Injunction Relief Requested by Plaintiff John Elliott Mayer, Jr. (MCO)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE re: #9 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous by Plaintiff John Elliott Mayer, Jr. (MCO)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED sua sponte for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, without prejudice to Plaintiff filing of an Amended Complaint. It is further Ordered that Plaintiff's Motion for [Preliminary] Injunction Cease and Desist (Doc. #5 ) is DENIED. It is further Ordered that the Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively for a More Definite Statement (Doc. #8 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. It is further Ordered that the Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint within 14 days of the filing date of this Order. It is further Ordered that the Clerk of the Court is directed to DISMISS all claims and to close this case, without further notice to Plaintiff, if Plaintiff fails to file the Amended Complaint within the 14-day time period set above. It is further Ordered that the Defendants need not respond to the Complaint; the time for filing a responsive pleading shall begin to run upon the filing of an Amended Complaint. (See attached Order for complete information.) Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 7/22/2019. (MFR)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous by Mark Napier. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Re: Motion to Dismiss/Motion for More Definite Statement/Motion to Extend Answer Deadline)(Roubicek, Laura)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons upon Leticia Ruiz, Front Clerk of AG Office on 7/8/2019. (MCO)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED : Proof of Service re: Summons upon Todd Lepird on behalf of Pima County Sheriff Department on 7/8/2019. (MCO)
July 3, 2019 Remark: Summons issued over counter as to Defendants Mark Brnovich, and Mark Napier This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.(BAC)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Injunction Cease and Desist by John Elliott Mayer, Jr. (BAC)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAC)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number TUC030621. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David C Bury. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-00338-TUC-DCB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number TUC030621 filed by John Elliott Mayer, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayer v. Brnovich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Napier
Represented By: Laura Louise Roubicek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Brnovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Elliott Mayer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?