Abramson v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kim D Abramson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv00362
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: D Thomas Ferraro
Referring Judge: Rosemary Marquez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Chantal Jenkins appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Jenkins, Chantal)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that this case is referred to Magistrate Judge D. Thomas Ferraro for all pretrial proceedings and report and recommendation. All future filings in this case shall be designated: CV-19-362-TUC-RM(DTF). Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 8/6/19.(BAC)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this Case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge, Rosemary Marquez. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-00362-RM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.(BAC)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Election Form Deadline resent to plaintiff on this date. (BAC)
August 1, 2019 NOTICE of request for e-notices by J. Cole Hernandez. (Hernandez, J)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General. (LML)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #3 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefore. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service of the summons and complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 7/18/19. (BAC)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable D Thomas Ferraro. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-00362-TUC-DTF. Magistrate Election form attached. (KAH)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Kim D Abramson. (Feldman, Blair) (KAH)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Kim D Abramson.(Feldman, Blair) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(KAH)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kim D Abramson. (Feldman, Blair) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abramson v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim D Abramson
Represented By: Blair Ariel Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Chantal Renee Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?