Mitchell v. Unknown Party et al
Plaintiff: Donald Mitchell
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons, Unknown Hudack, Unknown Hadaway, Unknown Waite, S Bass, Unknown Ash, Unknown Radford and Unknown Party
Case Number: 4:2019cv00402
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Pro Se (Tucson)
Referring Judge: James A Soto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED: (1) The Clerk's Office must promptly transmit by email a copy of this Order and a copy of the Courts August 19, 2019 Order (Doc. 3) to Civil Chief of the United States Attorneys Office Michael Ambri: michael.ambri@usdoj.gov. (2) No later than 10 days from the filing date of this Order, Defendant Ash must respond to the portion of Plaintiff's Complaint/Motion seeking a preliminary injunction (Doc. 1), and Plaintiff must file any reply no later than 10 days thereafter. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 10/4/2019. (MCO)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 SERVICE EXECUTED : Return of Service re: summons/complaint/order upon Unknown Ash on 8/28/2019. (BAR)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE, Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Donald Mitchell. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 8/16/2019. (BAR)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED: Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. Plaintiff's initial pleading #1 is construed as a civil rights Complaint pursuant to Bivens v. Six Unknown Named Agents of Federal Bureau of Narcotics, 403 U.S. 388 (1971), and a Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Defendants USP-Tucson Warden, FMC-Rochester Warden, Bass, Hadaway, Radford, Waite, BOP, and Hudack are dismissed without prejudice. Defendant Ash must answer the Complaint. The Clerks Office must prepare a summons for Defendant Ash, at the listed address. The Clerk of Court must expeditiously provide the completed summons to the United States Marshal. Plaintiffs request for injunctive relief in his initial pleading is denied in part as to his request for a temporary restraining order. The Court will not rule at this time on Plaintiffs request for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 8/16/2019. (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.(BAR)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MCO)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT (TRO Requested) and Request for Counsel filed by Donald Mitchell. (55 pages) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Unknown Party et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hudack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hadaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Waite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Radford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?