Hernandez v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Richard Hernandez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv00449
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline M Rateau
Referring Judge: Jennifer G Zipps
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. Rateau for all pretrial proceedings and report and recommendation in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and LR Civ. 72.1 and 72.2. All future filings in this case shall be designated: CV-19-00449-TUC-JGZ (JMR). Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 9/18/2019. (ARC)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this Case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge, Jennifer G Zipps. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-00449-JGZ. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.(BAC)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that the motion #2 to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED and Plaintiff may proceed without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefor. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau on 9/12/2019. (MCO)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Within sixty days from the filing of the answer and record, Plaintiff must file an opening brief in the form prescribed by LRCiv 16.1. Within thirty days after service of Plaintiff's opening brief, Defendant must file an answering brief. Plaintiff may file a reply brief within fifteen days after service of Defendant's answering brief. If either party fails to fully comply with this Order, the Court may strike the non-complying brief, dismiss the case, or remand to the agency as appropriate. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). [Review ORDER for details.] Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau on 9/11/2019. (MCO)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jacqueline M Rateau. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-449-TUC-JR. Magistrate Election form attached. (ARC)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Richard Hernandez. (Feldman, Blair) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ARC)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Richard Hernandez. (Feldman, Blair) (ARC)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Richard Hernandez. (Feldman, Blair) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Hernandez
Represented By: Blair Ariel Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?