A.I.I.L. et al v. Sessions et al
Plaintiff: J.L.V.A., A.I.I.L., L.L.H.O., J.I.S. and J.J.P.B.
Defendant: L Francis Cissna, Alex Azar, Matthew Albence, Margaret Wynne, Gene Hamilton, E Scott Lloyd, Unknown Parties, Ronald D Vitiello, Kevin K McAleenan, John F Kelly, Mark Morgan, Thomas Homan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Carla Provost and Stephen Miller
Case Number: 4:2019cv00481
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Soto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 17 *Redacted Summons pursuant to 11/12/19 Order by A.I.I.L., J.I.S., J.J.P.B., J.L.V.A., L.L.H.O.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Affidavit, #21 Affidavit, #22 Affidavit, #23 Affidavit)(Chepiga, Geoffrey) *Modified on 11/14/2019 to correct filing title (DLC).
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Seal Documents Containing Defendants' Home Addresses. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 11/12/19. (See attached PDF for complete information.) (KAH)
November 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Seal Document Containing Defendants' Home Addresses by A.I.I.L., J.I.S., J.J.P.B., J.L.V.A., L.L.H.O.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chepiga, Geoffrey)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by A.I.I.L., J.I.S., J.J.P.B., J.L.V.A., L.L.H.O.: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Class Action Complaint, and Civil Cover Sheet upon Alex Azar on 10/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service by Cerified Mail Return Receipt Requested, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service by Certified Mail)(Chepiga, Geoffrey)
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by A.I.I.L., J.I.S., J.J.P.B., J.L.V.A., L.L.H.O.: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Class Action Complaint, and Civil Cover Sheet upon Thomas Homan on 10/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service by Cerified Mail Return Receipt Requested, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service by Certified Mail)(Chepiga, Geoffrey)
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by A.I.I.L., J.I.S., J.J.P.B., J.L.V.A., L.L.H.O.: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Class Action Complaint, and Civil Cover Sheet upon Stephen Miller on 10/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service by Cerified Mail Return Receipt Requested, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service by Certified Mail)(Chepiga, Geoffrey)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by A.I.I.L., J.I.S., J.J.P.B., J.L.V.A., L.L.H.O.: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Class Action Complaint, and Civil Cover Sheet upon Gene Hamilton on 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service by Cerified Mail Return Receipt Requested, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service by Certified Mail)(Chepiga, Geoffrey)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by A.I.I.L., J.I.S., J.J.P.B., J.L.V.A., L.L.H.O.: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Class Action Complaint, and Civil Cover Sheet upon Jefferson Beauregard Sessions III on 10/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service by Cerified Mail Return Receipt Requested, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service by Certified Mail)(Chepiga, Geoffrey)
October 23, 2019 Remark: Out of state attorney Judy Rabinovitz removed as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 21, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Alexander A Reinert on behalf of Plaintiffs A.I.I.L., J.I.S., J.J.P.B., J.L.V.A., and L.L.H.O.. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 18, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Geoffrey R Chepiga, Jacqueline P Rubin, and Steven C Herzog on behalf of Plaintiffs A.I.I.L., J.I.S., J.J.P.B., J.L.V.A., and L.L.H.O.. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 18, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Anand Balakrishnan, Daniel A Galindo, Emily Goldberg, and Hallie S Goldblatt on behalf of Plaintiffs A.I.I.L., J.I.S., J.J.P.B., J.L.V.A., and L.L.H.O.. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Submitted by A.I.I.L., J.I.S., J.J.P.B., J.L.V.A., L.L.H.O.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Margaret Wynne)(Lieberman, Martin)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Reissued as to Mark Morgan to include Seal of the Clerk of the Court. (LML)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Matthew Albence, Alex Azar, L Francis Cissna, Gene Hamilton, John F Kelly, E Scott Lloyd, Kevin K McAleenan, Stephen Miller, Mark Morgan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Carla Provost, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D Vitiello, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)(LML)
October 9, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Lee Gelernt on behalf of Plaintiffs A.I.I.L., J.I.S., J.J.P.B., J.L.V.A., and L.L.H.O.. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Submitted by A.I.I.L., J.I.S., J.J.P.B., J.L.V.A., L.L.H.O.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Alex Azar, Secretary of the US Dept. of HHS, #2 Summons L. Francis Cissna, Former Director of USCIS, #3 Summons Gene Hamilton, Counselor to the Attorney General, #4 Summons John F. Kelly, Former White House Chief of Staff and former DHS Secretary, #5 Summons E. Scott Lloyd, Former Director of the US Office of Refugee Resettlement, #6 Summons Kevin K. McAleenan, Acting Secretary of DHS and former Commissioner of CBP, #7 Summons Michael Bailey, US Attorney's Office, #8 Summons Stephen Miller, Senior Advisor to the President, #9 Summons Mark Morgan, Acting Commissioner of CBP, #10 Summons Kirstjen Nielsen, Former Secretary of DHS, #11 Summons Carla Provost, Chief of CBP US Border Control, #12 Summons Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, Former Attorney General of the United States, #13 Summons USA, Attorney General of the United States, #14 Summons Ronald D. Vitiello, Former Director of ICE)(Lieberman, Martin)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17474464. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Soto. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-481-TUC-JAS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Using Initials and Pseudonyms by A.I.I.L., J.I.S., J.J.P.B., J.L.V.A., L.L.H.O.. (Lieberman, Martin) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ARC)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17474464 filed by L.L.H.O., A.I.I.L., J.L.V.A., J.I.S., J.J.P.B.. (Lieberman, Martin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.I.I.L. et al v. Sessions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald D Vitiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Homan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Provost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.L.V.A.
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martin Lieberman
Represented By: Alexander A Reinert
Represented By: Anand Balakrishnan
Represented By: Geoffrey R Chepiga
Represented By: Steven C Herzog
Represented By: Jacqueline P Rubin
Represented By: Hallie S Goldblatt
Represented By: Daniel A Galindo
Represented By: Emily Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.I.I.L.
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martin Lieberman
Represented By: Alexander A Reinert
Represented By: Anand Balakrishnan
Represented By: Geoffrey R Chepiga
Represented By: Steven C Herzog
Represented By: Jacqueline P Rubin
Represented By: Hallie S Goldblatt
Represented By: Daniel A Galindo
Represented By: Emily Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.L.H.O.
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martin Lieberman
Represented By: Alexander A Reinert
Represented By: Anand Balakrishnan
Represented By: Geoffrey R Chepiga
Represented By: Steven C Herzog
Represented By: Jacqueline P Rubin
Represented By: Hallie S Goldblatt
Represented By: Daniel A Galindo
Represented By: Emily Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.I.S.
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martin Lieberman
Represented By: Alexander A Reinert
Represented By: Anand Balakrishnan
Represented By: Geoffrey R Chepiga
Represented By: Steven C Herzog
Represented By: Jacqueline P Rubin
Represented By: Hallie S Goldblatt
Represented By: Daniel A Galindo
Represented By: Emily Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.J.P.B.
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Martin Lieberman
Represented By: Alexander A Reinert
Represented By: Anand Balakrishnan
Represented By: Geoffrey R Chepiga
Represented By: Steven C Herzog
Represented By: Jacqueline P Rubin
Represented By: Hallie S Goldblatt
Represented By: Daniel A Galindo
Represented By: Emily Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?