Koskinen v. Standard Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Jill Koskinen
Defendant: Albertson's LLC and Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00510
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Bruce G Macdonald
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement by Standard Insurance Company. (Andrews, Ann-Martha)
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Albertson's LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bressler, Stephen)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M Bressler on behalf of Albertson's LLC. (Bressler, Stephen)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrews, Ann-Martha)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Election Form Deadline resent to plaintiff on this date. (BAC)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jill Koskinen: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Pleadings upon Albertson's LLC on October 28, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mause, Patrick)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jill Koskinen: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Pleadings upon The Standard Insurance Company on October 28, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mause, Patrick)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Standard Insurance Company and Albertson's LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17545464. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Bruce G Macdonald. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-510-TUC-BGM. Magistrate Election form attached. (DLC)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Jill Koskinen. (Mause, Patrick) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DLC)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17545464 filed by Jill Koskinen. (Mause, Patrick) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koskinen v. Standard Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertson's LLC
Represented By: Stephen M Bressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Ann-Martha Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Koskinen
Represented By: Patrick W Mause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?