Granillo et al v. Ethicon Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Monica Granillo and Henry Granillo
Defendant: Ethicon Incorporated, Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00529
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Maria S Aguilera
Referring Judge: Cindy K Jorgenson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDERED that a Status Conference is set for January 8, 2020, at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera. Counsel shall be prepared to identify and discuss all outstanding pretrial matters. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel may appear telephonically. Counsel who intends to appear telephonically shall inform the Court of such intent by emailing Chambers at < no later than January 6, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera on 12/18/19. (MYE)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: This case is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera for all pretrial proceedings and a report and recommendation in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), Fed.R.Civ.P. 72, and 72.2. of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Arizona. All future filings in this case shall be designated: CV-19-00529-TUC-CKJ(MSA). Signed by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 12/10/2019. (ARC)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson (Doc. #49 ) is denied without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 12/3/2019. (ARC)
December 3, 2019 Remark: Out of state counsel Priscilla Jimenez, David B Thomas, Susan M Robinson, Molly E Flynn, William M Gage, Anita Modak-Truran, Christy D Jones, Jeffrey Royal Johnson, and Kari L Sutherland removed for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 3, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Braden R Lepisto, Christopher A Gomez, and Lee B Balefsky on behalf of Plaintiffs Henry Granillo and Monica Granillo. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 26, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ethicon Incorporated, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnston, Bradley)
November 19, 2019 Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this Case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge, Cindy K Jorgenson. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-529-TUC-CKJ. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
November 19, 2019 Filing 47 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
November 18, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley James Johnston on behalf of Ethicon Incorporated, Johnson & Johnson. (Johnston, Bradley)
November 18, 2019 Filing 44 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
November 8, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Paul S Rosenblatt on behalf of Defendants Ethicon Incorporated, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 1, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
November 1, 2019 Filing 41 Notice to the Southern District of West Virginia advising of receipt of 2:13-cv-06575, case transferred. (DLC)
November 1, 2019 Filing 40 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Maria S Aguilera. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-529-TUC-MSA. Magistrate Election form attached. (DLC)
November 1, 2019 Filing 39 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-06575 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
October 28, 2019 Filing 38 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (2087) P mte Dr. Kim Kenton, #2 Exhibit (2931) Plaintiff's memo in opp to MTE Rosi w exhibits, #3 Exhibit (2949) P response MTE Pence, #4 Exhibit (3767) P Opp to MTE Klinge Part 1, #5 Exhibit (3767) P Opp to MTE Klinge Part 2, #6 Exhibit (3767) P Opp to MTE Klinge Part 3, #7 Exhibit (3767) P Opp to MTE Klinge Part 4, #8 Exhibit (5482) P memo in opp to MTE Rosenzweig w exh, #9 Exhibit (7045) P opp memo to D mte Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit (6882) P mte Kammerer Doak)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 37 SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 (6882) P mte Dr. Dorothy Kammerer-Doak, #2 (6885) P memo in support MTE Kammerer-Doak, #3 (7029) D response MTE Kammerer-Doak, #4 (2087) P mte Dr. Kim Kenton, #5 (2088) P memo in support MTE Kenton, #6 (2132) D response MTE Kenton, #7 (2244) P reply MTE Kenton, #8 (2939) D opp memo MTE Kenton, #9 (6978) D adoption response MTE Kenton w8, #10 (7135) P adoption reply MTE Kenton, #11 (2076) P MTE Dr. Terri Longacre, #12 (2098) P memo in support MTE Dr. Terri Longacre, #13 (2140) D response to MTE Dr. Longacre, #14 (2253) P memo in support MTE Dr. Longacre, #15 (6820) P adoption MTE Longacre, #16 (6969) D adoption response MTE Longacre, #17 (7099) P adoption reply MTE Longacre, #18 (2205) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.._Part1, #19 (2205) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.._Part2, #20 (2205) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.._Part3, #21 (2205) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.._Part4, #22 (2205) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.._Part5, #23 (2205) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.._Part6, #24 (2205) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.._Part7, #25 (2205) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.._Part8, #26 (2205) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.._Part9, #27 (2205) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.._Part10, #28 (2205) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.._Part11, #29 (2205) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.._Part12, #30 (2205) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.._Part13, #31 (2205) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.._Part14, #32 (2205) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.._Part15, #33 (2205) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.._Part16, #34 (2205) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.._Part17, #35 (2205) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., P.E.._Part18, #36 (2206) MEMO by All Plaintiffs in support of MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinion of Steven MacLean, Ph.D., #37 (2287) Defendants Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Steven Maclean, Ph.D - Part1, #38 (2287) Defendants Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Steven Maclean, Ph.D - Part2, #39 (2287) Defendants Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Steven Maclean, Ph.D - Part3, #40 (2287) Defendants Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Steven Maclean, Ph.D - Part4, #41 (2287) Defendants Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Steven Maclean, Ph.D - Part5, #42 (2287) Defendants Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Steven Maclean, Ph.D - Part6, #43 (2297) REPLY by All Plaintiffs to Response In Opposition to Motion to Limit Testimony of Steven Maclean, Ph.D., #44 (2825) Motion to Exclude or limit the Opinions and Testimony of Steven Maclean PHD, #45 (2826) Memo in support to Exclude or Limit the opinions and testimony of Steven Maclean PHD, #46 (2942) RESPONSE by Defendants IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF STEVEN MACLEAN, PH.D., #47 (3053) REPLY by ALL Plaintiffs in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude or Limit the Opinions and Test of Steven Maclean, Ph.D. Part1, #48 (3053) REPLY by ALL Plaintiffs in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude or Limit the Opinions and Test of Steven Maclean, Ph.D. Part2, #49 (3053) REPLY by ALL Plaintiffs in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude or Limit the Opinions and Test of Steven Maclean, Ph.D. Part3, #50 (6998) NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Steven Maclean, M.D. for Wave 8, #51 (7100) NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Steven MacLean, Ph.D. for Wave 8 by All Plaintiffs, #52 (2817) D Motion to Exclude Certain General Opinions of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D., #53 (2818) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Certain General Opinions of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D., #54 (2931) Plaintiffs memo in opposition to motion to exclude Dr. Rosenzweig)(Balefsky, Lee) (Modified on 10/28/2019 to add party filers)(slr). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 36 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 (218) Pretrial Order #12, #2 (219) Short Form Complaint, #3 (220) Master Long Form Complaint and Jury Demand, #4 (221) Master Answer and Jury Demand of Defendant Ethicon, Inc., #5 (223) Master Answer and Jury Demand of Defendant Johnson and Johnson, #6 (235) Pretrial Order #13, #7 239) MASTER ANSWER AND JURY DEMAND OF DEFENDANT ETHICON, INC. TO FIRST AMENDED MASTER COMPLAINT, #8 (240) MASTER ANSWER AND JURY DEMAND OF DEFENDANT ETHICON LLC TO FIRST AMENDED MASTER COMPLAINT, #9 (241) MASTER ANSWER AND JURY DEMAND OF DEFENDANT JOHNSON & JOHNSON TO FIRST AMENDED MASTER COMPLAINT, #10 (261) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #11 (262) Short Form Complaint, #12 (263) Amended Short Form Complaint, #13 264) Master Answer and Jury Demand of Ethicon to First Amended Complaint, #14 (266) Master Answer of J&J to First Amended Complaint, #15 (933) Short Form Complaint, #16 (934) Amended Short Form Complaint, #17 (1986) AMENDED MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Thomas C. Wright, #18 1988 - Memo in Support of AMENDED MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Thomas C. Wright, #19 (2039) Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Shelby Thames, #20 2042 - Memo in Support ofPlaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Shelby Thames, #21 (2044) Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude or Limit the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Nicolette Sigrid Horbach -Part 1, #22 (2044) Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude or Limit the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Nicolette Sigrid Horbach -Part 2, #23 (2044) Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude or Limit the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Nicolette Sigrid Horbach -Part 3, #24 (2044) Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude or Limit the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Nicolette Sigrid Horbach -Part 4, #25 2045 - Memo in Sipport of Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude or Limit the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Nicolette Sigrid Horbach, #26 (2060) Plaintiffs' motion to exclude Tim Ulatowski WAVE 1, #27 (2065) Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Their Daubert Motion to Exclude the Opinions of FDA Expert Timothy Ulatowski for Wave 8, #28 (2134) Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #29 (2143) RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS_ AMENDED MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF DR. THOMAS C. WRIGHT, #30 (2183) RESPONSE by Ethicon Women_s Health and Urology, Johnson & Johnson in opposition to 2044 MOTION by Certain Nicolette borbach MD, #31 (2187) RESPONSE by Ethicon Women_s Health and Urology, Johnson & Johnson in opposition to MOTION, #32 (2232) Plaintiffs_ Reply Brief in Support of Their Daubert Motion to Exclude FDA Expert Timothy Ulatowski, #33 (2235) REPLY by All Plaintiffs in Support of Motion to Exclude or Limit the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Nicolette Horbach, #34 (2247) REPLY in Support of Plaintiffs_ Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Dr. Shelby Thames, #35 (2455) Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #36 2458) MEMO by All Plaintiffs in support of MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Shelby Thames, #37 (2553) Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Shelby Thames - Part 1, #38 (2553) Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Shelby Thames - Part 2, #39 (2553) Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Shelby Thames - Part 3, #40 (2553) Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Shelby Thames - Part 4, #41 (2553) Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Shelby Thames - Part 5, #42 (2621) Reply in support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Dr. Shelby Thames, #43 (2759) Defendants Motion to Exclude Peggy Pence, PH.D, #44 (2760) Defendants Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Peggy Pence, PH.D, #45 (2818) Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Certain General Opinions of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D, #46 (2839) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Shelby Thames_32861846_1_Part1, #47 (2839) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Shelby Thames_32861846_1_Part2, #48 (2839) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Shelby Thames_32861846_1_Part3, #49 (2841) Memo in support of MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Shelby Thames, #50 (2907) Memo in Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude General OpinionTestimony of Nicolette Horbach MD, #51 (2910) NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE AND NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF PRIOR DAUBERT RESPONSE REGARDING TIMOTHY ULATOWSKI FOR WAVE 3, #52 (2949) MEMO by ALL Plaintiffs in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude Peggy Pence, Ph.D, #53 (2957) RESPONSE by Ethicon and Women_s Health and Urology in Opposition to Plaintiffs_ Motion to Exclude or Limit the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Shelby Thames, #54 (3017) REPLY by Ethicon in Support of Motion to Exclude Peggy Pence, PH.D, #55 (3037) REPLY by ALL Plaintiffs in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Dr. Shelby Thames, #56 (3128) Transfer Order, #57 (3619) MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part1, #58 (3619) MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part2, #59 (3619) MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part3, #60 (3619) MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part4, #61 (3621) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev, #62 (3626) MOTION by Ethicon To Limit the Testimony of Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge_Part1, #63 3626) MOTION by Ethicon To Limit the Testimony of Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge_Part2, #64 3626) MOTION by Ethicon To Limit the Testimony of Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge_Part3, #65 3626) MOTION by Ethicon To Limit the Testimony of Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge_Part4, #66 3626) MOTION by Ethicon To Limit the Testimony of Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge_Part5, #67 3626) MOTION by Ethicon To Limit the Testimony of Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge_Part6, #68 3626) MOTION by Ethicon To Limit the Testimony of Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge_Part7, #69 (3630) MEMORANDUM In Support of Motion to Limit Testimony of Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge, #70 (3767) Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to D Motion to Exclude Dr. Klinge, #71 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part1, #72 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part2, #73 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part3, #74 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part4, #75 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part5, #76 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part6, #77 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part7, #78 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part8, #79 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part9, #80 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part10, #81 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part11, #82 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part12, #83 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part13, #84 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part14, #85 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part15, #86 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part16, #87 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part17, #88 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part18, #89 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part19, #90 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part20, #91 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part21, #92 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part22, #93 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part23, #94 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part24, #95 (3790
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A It is DIRECTED that on 10/30/2019 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 10/29/2019 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/16/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kew) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - List of Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Monica Granillo, Henry Granillo (Balefsky, Lee) (Modified on 4/26/2019 to add party filer) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (sak) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Filing 30 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to #28 Response In Opposition. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM by Henry Granillo, Monica Granillo in opposition to #26 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 28 OPPOSITION by Henry Granillo, Monica Granillo to #26 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson in support of #26 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 25 STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES REGARDING DEPOSITIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FRIENDS AND FAMILY MEMBERS by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Monica Granillo, Henry Granillo (Rosenblatt, Paul)(Modified on 10/4/2018 to add party filers)(rmc). [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendant's Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Issuing Subpoena to Dr. Mitzi J. Barmatz by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Rosenblatt, Paul) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 22 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Mitzi J. Barmatz on 9/21/2018 at 5:00 p.m. (Rosenblatt, Paul) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 21 RESPONSE by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to #18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jeffrey Royal Johnson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Johnson, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Mitzi J. Barmatz on 8/14/2018 at 2:00 p.m. (Rosenblatt, Paul) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL With Prejudice by Henry Granillo, Monica Granillo pursuant to Rule 41, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRETRIAL ORDER # 303 (Amended Docket Control Order Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 280. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases) (pma) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Henry Granillo, Monica Granillo for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production. (Rosenblatt, Paul) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
April 13, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Molly E. Flynn on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Flynn, Molly) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
April 2, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Monica Granillo on 4/20/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
March 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Paul Stokely Rosenblatt on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Rosenblatt, Paul) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
March 19, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Anita Modak-Truran on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
January 31, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Mitzi J. Marmatz on 3/5/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Jones, Alyson) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
June 5, 2017 Filing 8 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Henry Granillo, Monica Granillo. (Jimenez, Priscilla) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
January 11, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
October 1, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
January 29, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
April 24, 2013 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
April 3, 2013 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, and Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (jws) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
April 1, 2013 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 41 (Defendant Fact Sheet) entered on 03/15/2013 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (Attachment: #1 Defendant's Fact Sheet) (jap) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]
March 29, 2013 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt # 0425-2312762. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mh) [Transferred from wvsd on 11/1/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Granillo et al v. Ethicon Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Incorporated
Represented By: Jeffrey Royal Johnson
Represented By: Susan M Robinson
Represented By: Christy D Jones
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Paul Stokely Rosenblatt
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: Kari L Sutherland
Represented By: Molly E Flynn
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Represented By: Paul S Rosenblatt
Represented By: Bradley James Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Jeffrey Royal Johnson
Represented By: Susan M Robinson
Represented By: Christy D Jones
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Paul Stokely Rosenblatt
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: Kari L Sutherland
Represented By: Molly E Flynn
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Represented By: Paul S Rosenblatt
Represented By: Bradley James Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon LLC
Represented By: Susan M Robinson
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Paul Stokely Rosenblatt
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: Molly E Flynn
Represented By: Paul S Rosenblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Granillo
Represented By: Michelle L Tiger
Represented By: Priscilla E Jimenez
Represented By: Lee B Balefsky
Represented By: Christopher A Gomez
Represented By: Braden R Lepisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Granillo
Represented By: Michelle L Tiger
Represented By: Priscilla E Jimenez
Represented By: Lee B Balefsky
Represented By: Christopher A Gomez
Represented By: Braden R Lepisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?