Bernardi & Associates Incorporated v. Perfect Harvest Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Bernardi & Associates Incorporated
Defendant: Jorge A Mercado, Perfect Harvest Incorporated and Trenton J. Mercado
Intervenor Plaintiff: IPR Solutions, LLC d/b/a IPR Fresh
Case Number: 4:2019cv00532
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Maria S Aguilera
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Jorge A Mercado, Perfect Harvest Incorporated, and Trenton J. Mercado. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(LML). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
December 17, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Submitted by IPR Solutions, LLC d/b/a IPR Fresh. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Jorge Mercado, #2 Summons to Trenton Mercado)(Stokes, Craig)
December 17, 2019 Filing 14 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT filed by IPR Solutions, LLC d/b/a IPR Fresh.(Stokes, Craig)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING IPR Solutions, LLC's #7 Motion to Intervene. IPR Solutions, LLC's proposed Complaint in Intervention shall be filed within 7 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera on 12/16/19. (BAC)
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IPR Solutions, LLC d/b/a IPR Fresh. (Stokes, Craig)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Intervene Unopposed Motion and Brief to Intervene by IPR Solutions, LLC d/b/a IPR Fresh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Intervenor Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stokes, Craig)
November 12, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Bart M Botta on behalf of Plaintiff Bernardi & Associates Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Jorge A Mercado, Perfect Harvest Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17602660. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Maria S. Aguilera. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-532-TUC-MSA. Magistrate Election form attached. (KEP)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Bernardi & Associates Incorporated. (Botta, Bart) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(KEP)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bernardi & Associates Incorporated. (Botta, Bart) (KEP)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17602660 filed by Bernardi & Associates Incorporated. (Botta, Bart) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernardi & Associates Incorporated v. Perfect Harvest Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge A Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perfect Harvest Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trenton J. Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernardi & Associates Incorporated
Represented By: Bart M Botta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: IPR Solutions, LLC d/b/a IPR Fresh
Represented By: Craig Alan Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?