Bells v. Von Blanckensee et al
Plaintiff: Charlie Buddha Bells, Jr.
Defendant: M Vasquez, Unknown Wade, K Falconer, Unknown Pullen, Unknown Parties, J Ruff, C Guiterrez, Unknown Soto, A Ash, D Florez, Unknown Palmer, Barbara Von Blanckensee, Unknown O'Neil, A Verduzco, Unknown Lawson, Unknown Blandeau, Unknown Hollis, Unknown Schindle, Unknown Carvajal and Unknown Gallion
Case Number: 4:2019cv00561
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Pro Se (Tucson)
Referring Judge: James A Soto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Marcus McGowan #25055-031. (2 pages) (BAR)
December 30, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by Charlie Buddha Bells, Jr. (2 pages) (BAR)
December 30, 2019 Filing 14 Document was filed in the wrong case. All docket text associated with the entry has been removed on 12/31/2019 (CEI)
December 30, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Charlie Buddha Bells, Jr. (1 page) (BAR)
December 30, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Plaintiff re submitted filings. (1 page) (BAR)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Charlie Buddha Bells, Jr. (BAR)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Charlie Buddha Bells, Jr. (BAR)
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against K Falconer, C Guiterrez, Unknown Lawson, Unknown Palmer, Unknown Pullen, J Ruff, Unknown Soto, M Vasquez, A Verduzco, Barbara Von Blanckensee, Unknown Wade, Unknown Carvajal, Unknown Gallion, Unknown Schindle, Unknown Hollis, Unknown Blandeau filed by Charlie Buddha Bells, Jr. (13 pages)(BAR)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED: Plaintiff's #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is denied without prejudice. Within in 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Compel Judgment or Offer to Settle Complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with Rule 3.4 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file an amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 12/13/2019. (BAR)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel Judgment or Offer to Settle Complaint by Charlie Buddha Bells, Jr. (13 pages) (BAR)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Charlie Buddha Bells, Jr. (BAR)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Charlie Buddha Bells, Jr. (2 pages) (BAR)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED: Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice. The #2 Complaint (Motion to Compel Courts for Preliminary Injunction) is dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with Rule 3.4 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file an amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 12/3/2019. (BAR)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (BAR)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Charlie Buddha Bells, Jr. (9 pages) (Attachments: #1 Letter)(BAR)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDERED: This matter is severed into individual actions, one for each Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court must assign a new case number to each newly created individual action. The Clerk of Court must file a copy of the Motion to Compel Courts for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 1) and this Order in each new case. Each individual Plaintiff must proceed independently from this point forward and will not be regarded as a co-Plaintiff. All further pleadings, motions, or other papers submitted by an individual Plaintiff must be filed in that individuals case, and signed by that individual Plaintiff personally, or they will be stricken. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 11/26/2019. (BAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bells v. Von Blanckensee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Falconer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Pullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Ruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Guiterrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Ash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Florez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Von Blanckensee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown O'Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Verduzco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Blandeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hollis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Schindle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Gallion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Buddha Bells, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?