Murphy v. American Airlines Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Helen Murphy
Defendant: Unknown Parties, American Airlines Incorporated and Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas
Case Number: 4:2019cv00574
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Soto
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by American Airlines Incorporated, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas.(Shippee, Meredith)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Airlines Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent American Airlines Group, Inc. for American Airlines Incorporated. (Shippee, Meredith)
January 10, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Martin J Bishop on behalf of Defendants American Airlines Incorporated and Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 9, 2020 Remark: Out of state attorney Martin J Bishop removed as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 7, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Airlines Incorporated, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas, Unknown Parties filed by Helen Murphy. (Hill, David) (KEP)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Amend/Correct. As the amended complaint supersedes the previous complaint, the motion to dismiss (Doc. #4 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 1/6/2020. (KEP)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Helen Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Complaint, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Hill, David)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas. (Shippee, Meredith)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INFORMATIONAL ORDER re Communication with the Court, Dispositive Motions, Proposed Orders, Paper Copies, Exhibits, Authority Binders and Emailing Documents. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 12/19/2019. (BAR)
December 16, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Meredith A Shippee on behalf of Defendants American Airlines Incorporated and Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and, MOTION to Strike Jury Demand by American Airlines Incorporated, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas. (Shippee, Meredith)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas. (ARC)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17712544. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Soto. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-574-TUC-JAS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
December 9, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Demand for Jury Trial, FASTAR Certificate upon American Airlines Incorporated on 10/14/2019. (Original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 10/28/2019); upon Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas on 11/12/2019. (Original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 11/12/2019) (ARC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20194586. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17712544 filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas. (Langan, Thomas) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. American Airlines Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Murphy
Represented By: David E Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Incorporated
Represented By: Meredith A Shippee
Represented By: Martin J Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas
Represented By: Thomas Anthony Langan
Represented By: Meredith A Shippee
Represented By: Martin J Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?