McCune v. Nova Home Loans
Plaintiff: McCune
Defendant: Mark McCune and Nova Home Loans
Case Number: 4:2019cv00600
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Rosemary Marquez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION Emergency Motion for Hearing before March 4th to Correct the Illegal April 1st 2016 Deed of Trust by Mark McCune. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ARC)
February 19, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION Emergency Motion to Set Hearing before March 4th 2020 to Correct the Illegal April 1st 2016 Deed of Trust by Mark McCune. (ARC)
February 13, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re: (43 in 4:19-cv-00525-CKJ) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by PHH Mortgage. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C) (Associated Cases: 4:19-cv-00525-CKJ, 4:19-cv-00600-RM) (Krotzer, Solomon)
February 6, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re: (43 in 4:19-cv-00525-CKJ, 43 in 4:19-cv-00525-CKJ) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Mark McCune. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Associated Cases: 4:19-cv-00525-CKJ, 4:19-cv-00600-RM) (ARC)
January 28, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by PHH Mortgage. (Associated Cases: CV-19-00525-TUC-CKJ,CV-19-00600-TUC-RM) (Krotzer, Solomon)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED that Plaintiff's #8 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order to Stop Jan. 8 Foreclosure is denied. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 1/3/2020. (BAR)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Defendant Mark McCune. (BAR)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Stop Jan 8th Foreclosure by Mark McCune. (BAR)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that Plaintiff's #2 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order is denied. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 12/30/2019. (BAR)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAC)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Rosemary Marquez. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-00600-TUC-RM. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Mark McCune. (BAC)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Mark McCune. (BAC)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (TRO Requested) filed by Mark McCune.(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCune v. Nova Home Loans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark McCune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nova Home Loans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McCune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?