Paul F and Mindy L Blaski Trust Dated 10-25-17 v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Paul F and Mindy L Blaski Trust Dated
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00052
Filed: January 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: David C Bury
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Stafford, Karen)
March 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Paul F and Mindy L Blaski Trust Dated 10-25-17. (Ponzo, Michael)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to Rule 16, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a telephonic Pretrial Scheduling Conference is set for 5/7/20 at 10:30 p.m. with the Judge's law clerk. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 3/16/20.(BAC)
March 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Paul F and Mindy L Blaski Trust Dated 10-25-17. (Ponzo, Michael)
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Stafford, Karen)
January 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE re: of Filing Additional Exhibit to Petition for Removal by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company re: #1 Notice of Removal . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Meyer, Cassandra)
January 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
January 30, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17899111. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David C. Bury. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-52-TUC-DCB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
January 30, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Stafford, Karen) (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure)(KEP)
January 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20195895. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17899111 filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Stafford, Karen) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Notice)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul F and Mindy L Blaski Trust Dated 10-25-17 v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul F and Mindy L Blaski Trust Dated
Represented By: Michael John Ponzo
Represented By: Courtney Brady Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Cassandra Victoria Meyer
Represented By: Karen Christine Stafford
Represented By: Victoria Renee Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?