Praetorian Insurance Company v. Waligore et al
Plaintiff: Praetorian Insurance Company
Defendant: Jane Waligore, Ronald Waligore, Jorge Delgado and Laura Lozano
Case Number: 4:2020cv00054
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Rosemary Marquez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDERED that Defendants Jorge Lozano and Laura Lozano's Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the First Amended Declaratory Judgment Complaint #16 is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Jorge Lozano and Laura Lozano shall file their Response on or before March 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 03/02/20. (MYE)
February 27, 2020 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer first amended declaratory judgment complaint by Jorge Delgado, Laura Lozano. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Prop Order)(Sannes, Joel)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #14 is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Ronald Waligore and Jane Waligore shall file their Response on or before April 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 02/24/20. (MYE)
February 21, 2020 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Declaratory Judgment Complaint by Jane Waligore, Ronald Waligore. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order to extend time)(Denker, Thomas)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, the Clerk of Court shall seal Document 5, including all attachments and Documents 9-3 and 9-4. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 2/4/20. (KAH)
February 4, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Jorge Delgado, Laura Lozano, Jane Waligore, Ronald Waligore. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 3, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Praetorian Insurance Company Second Amended Summonses. (Attachments: #1 Summons Second Amended Summons to Laura Lozano)(Sandstrom, Ryan)
February 3, 2020 Filing 10 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #9 Amended Complaint Exhibit A to First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Praetorian Insurance Company. (Sandstrom, Ryan)
February 3, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Praetorian Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Summons Amended Summons Jane Waligore, #3 Summons Amended Summons Jorge Delgado, #4 Summons Amended Summons Laura Lozano, #5 Summons Amended Summons Ronald Waligore)(Sandstrom, Ryan)
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT CORRECTED COMPLAINT PER COURT ORDER against All Defendants filed by Praetorian Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint)(Sandstrom, Ryan)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, the Clerk of Court is directed to seal Plaintiff's Complaint. Within 5 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff shall publicly file a copy of the Complaint that has been properly redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 1/31/20. (KAH)
January 31, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jorge Delgado, Laura Lozano, Jane Waligore, Ronald Waligore. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 31, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17900542. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Rosemary Marquez. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00054-TUC-RM. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Praetorian Insurance Company. (Sandstrom, Ryan) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(BAC)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Praetorian Insurance Company. (Sandstrom, Ryan) (BAC)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-17900542 filed by Praetorian Insurance Company. (Sandstrom, Ryan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(BAC) *Modified on 2/3/2020 to seal per Doc. #6 (KAH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Praetorian Insurance Company v. Waligore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Waligore
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Denker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Waligore
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Denker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Delgado
Represented By: Joel Eric Sannes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Lozano
Represented By: Joel Eric Sannes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Praetorian Insurance Company
Represented By: Ryan Paul Sandstrom
Represented By: Mark G Worischeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?