Hatten v. Grobet USA et al
Plaintiff: Renee Hatten
Defendant: Grobet USA, Vanderbilt Minerals LLC, Unknown Parties, Posner's Art Store Incorporated, Triarco Arts&Crafts LLC and Vanderbilt Company Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2020cv00099
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Leslie A Bowman
Referring Judge: Jennifer G Zipps
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 20 REQUEST re: Judicial Notice by Defendant Grobet USA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendricks, John)
May 7, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT AS TO TRIARCO ARTS & CRAFTS, LLC FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed by Renee Hatten. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(LeCointre, Jean-Michel)
May 4, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Remand filed by Renee Hatten. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(LeCointre, Jean-Michel)
April 30, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Ronald Lyle Hellbusch on behalf of Defendant Vanderbilt Minerals LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 27, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Oral Argument Requested) filed by Grobet USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Hendricks, John)
April 22, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Vanderbilt Minerals LLC.(Petri, Shawn)
April 20, 2020 Filing 15 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Suvir Dhar. Reason for return: Insufficiant Address. Document number 14. (MCO)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #13 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a response to the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #5 ) on or before May 18, 2020. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 4/15/2020. (MCO)
April 14, 2020 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT AS TO TRIARCO ARTS & CRAFTS, LLC FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Renee Hatten. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time, #2 Certificate of Service)(LeCointre, Jean-Michel)
April 13, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Renee Hatten. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit B to Memorandum in Support, #4 Exhibit C to Memorandum in Support, #5 Exhibit D to Memorandum in Support, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(LeCointre, Jean-Michel)
April 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE re: NOTICE OF FILING REPLACEMENT DELCARATION OF PARDEEP GUPTA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT AS TO TRIARCO ARTS & CRAFTS LLC FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Triarco Arts&Crafts LLC re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT AS TO TRIARCO ARTS & CRAFTS, LLC FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(O'Daniel, David)
April 7, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jean-Michel LeCointre on behalf of Plaintiff Renee Hatten. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 3, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Melissa C Schopfer on behalf of Plaintiff Renee Hatten. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 25, 2020 Filing 10 Minute Order: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this Case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge, Jennifer G Zipps. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-20-0099-TUC-JGZ. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
March 25, 2020 Filing 9 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Grobet File Company of America, LLC, Improperly Named and Served as Grobet USA by Grobet USA.(Hendricks, John)
March 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT AS TO TRIARCO ARTS & CRAFTS, LLC FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Triarco Arts&Crafts LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(O'Daniel, David)
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18048973. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Leslie A Bowman. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-99-TUC-LAB. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (ARC)
March 9, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grobet USA. (Hendricks, John) (ARC)
March 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20200532. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18048973 filed by Grobet USA. (Hendricks, John) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(ARC)
March 9, 2020 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Rule 102(A) FASTAR Certificate upon Grobet USA on 2/7/2020. (Original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 2/18/2020); Upon Posner's Art Store Incorporated on 2/5/2020. (Original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 2/7/2020); Upon Vanderbilt Minerals LLC on 2/5/2020. (Original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 2/11/2020); Upon Triarco Arts&Crafts LLC on 2/6/2020. (Original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 2/24/2020) (ARC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hatten v. Grobet USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grobet USA
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanderbilt Minerals LLC
Represented By: Ronald Lyle Hellbusch
Represented By: Shawn Michael Petri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Posner's Art Store Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triarco Arts&Crafts LLC
Represented By: David L O'Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanderbilt Company Incorporated
Represented By: Ronald Lyle Hellbusch
Represented By: Shawn Michael Petri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Hatten
Represented By: Timothy Perry Stackhouse
Represented By: Peter T Limperis
Represented By: Suvir Dhar
Represented By: Jean-Michel LeCointre
Represented By: Melissa C Schopfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?