Gila River Indian Community v. 99 Ranch LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gila River Indian Community
Defendant: M N LLC, Richard M Kaler, Francisco R Serna, Ruth Bible, The Householder Family, Limited Partnership, Scott K Bryce, Diane Rowley, Sheila Bodine, Kaler Ranch LLC, Blanca E Bowman, Robert K Lundell, Marian R Lunt, Lorenz Thelen, Curtis Canal Company of the Gila Valley Irrigation District, Marcella D Harris, Marilyn A Starr, Tommy C Clonts, Catherine M Corum, Ft Thomas Unified School District No 7, Kenneth S Claridge, Nancy A Thelen, Samuel Lee Lunt, Janette B Tyler, Bradley E Boyd, Dale S Lunt, Sherri Layton, James F Holder, Alice M Ellsworth, Roxanne Wilhelm, Jennifer B Lunt, Sam M Angle, Nedra MacLay, Linda C Lewis, Rosanna E Lopez, Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Elizabeth Hinton, Lucia Lunt, Graham County Community College District, Gary R Colvin, Jay D Colvin, Kay A Goodman, Tom L Haught, John L Lacey, Terry O Bowman, Matthew M Goodman, Janice Munson, Kim Sherwood, Ralph E Harris, Joe B Cannon, Leon J Reynolds, Layton & Sons LLC, Richard W Clark, Mary L Price, Denise Brooks, Larry D Rowley, Mervin J Wilhelm, Lunt's Dairy, Cunningham Properties Limited Partnership, Core Ag, LLC and/or Nopal Cactus Farms LLC, Daniel Sanchez, Richard G Lunt, Amanda D Conyer, 99 Ranch LLC, Matthew Sherwood, Janell Richins, Monica B Hancock, Marion S Pina, Colleen M. Lunt, Alma M Saline, Duncan, Town of, Sara C Bowman, Marcelino M Aragon, Donna R Burden, Marilyn P Larson, Gerald Ray Lunt, Wilbur H Lunt, Dee L Hancock, Joyce T Skinner, Daniel Bodine, Brenda Hinton Harvey, Brenda K Colvin, Alex E Morales Jr., Priscilla O Starkweather, Gila Valley Irrigation District, Jeffrey B Larson, Danny Carrell, Jace Hancock, Mt. Graham Hospital District, Max T Hinton, Jeane N. Lunt, Marlene N Serna, Lynn M Hancock, Jason Howard, Myrna J Curtis, Wendy K Bryce, Kelly D Cambern, Sammy L Smith, Charlene L Stacy, Linda M Stacy, Linda S Reeves, Julee Ann Lunt, Dawn Carabeo, Lawrence K McGarry, Molli A Haught, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Karen M Lacey, Nelson B Lunt, Jana L Reed, Sanford L Saline, Gilligan O Bowman, Gary D Bowen, Jimmie G Gomez, Thatcher 910 LLC, Gary A Bryce, DMMK FP LLC, Margaret Elizabeth Hansen, Lynn W Skinner, Sammie M Roden, John B Lunt, John R Carabeo, Kenneth B Harrington, Freeport-McMoran Safford Incorporated, Franklin B Ross, Duncan Unified School District No. 2, Lance Layton, Douglas D Stacy, John C Hancock, Keith Hansen, Mt. Graham Regional Medical Center Incorporated, William Cull, Geronimo FRC LLC, Norma G Henderson, Karyn Norton, North Shore River Side LLC, Clarice H Holder, Barbara L Bryce, Dennis E Stacy, Robert R Starkweather, Melvyn K Reeves, Betty J Clonts, Gregory R Larson, Edwin J Busby, Richard Reed, Stephanie Howard, Jacob E Starr, Merelene T Lunt, Dalia M Hirko, Core Ag LLC, Alex E Morales, Jr., Jeane N Lunt, Nopal Cactus Farms LLC, Colleen M Lunt and Householder Family Limited Partnership
Case Number: 4:2020cv00103
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Eric J Markovich
Referring Judge: Rosemary Marquez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 152 NOTICE of Appearance by David Albert Brown on behalf of Cunningham Properties Limited Partnership, Robert K Lundell, Thatcher 910 LLC. (Brown, David)
April 30, 2020 Filing 151 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Kay A Goodman, Matthew M Goodman, Alma M Saline, Sammy L Smith: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 04/30/2020 to Alma Saline, Matthew Goodman, Kay Goodman & Sammy Smith Acceptance of Service. (Brown, David)
April 28, 2020 Filing 150 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Householder Family, Limited Partnership on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 28, 2020 Filing 149 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Thatcher 910, LLC on 04/27/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 27, 2020 Filing 148 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon DMMK FP LLC on 04/20/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 27, 2020 Filing 147 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon 99 Ranch, LLC on 4/20/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 24, 2020 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by David Albert Brown on behalf of Sam M Angle, Donna R Burden, Catherine M Corum, DMMK FP LLC, Duncan, Town of, Alice M Ellsworth, Geronimo FRC LLC, Kay A Goodman, Matthew M Goodman, Jason Howard, Stephanie Howard, John L Lacey, Jeffrey B Larson, Lance Layton, Sherri Layton, Mt. Graham Hospital District, Mt. Graham Regional Medical Center Incorporated, Franklin B Ross. (Brown, David)
April 24, 2020 Filing 145 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Karyn Norton on 4/15/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 24, 2020 Filing 144 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Sanford L. Saline on 4/15/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 22, 2020 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by David Albert Brown on behalf of Ruth Bible, Gary D Bowen, Bradley E Boyd, Denise Brooks, Edwin J Busby, Dawn Carabeo, John R Carabeo, Danny Carrell, Richard W Clark, Brenda K Colvin, Jay D Colvin, Amanda D Conyer, Core Ag LLC, William Cull, Myrna J Curtis, Jimmie G Gomez, Dee L Hancock, Jace Hancock, Lynn M Hancock, Monica B Hancock, Kenneth B Harrington, Marcella D Harris, Ralph E Harris, Brenda Hinton Harvey, Molli A Haught, Tom L Haught, Richard M Kaler, Kaler Ranch LLC, Gregory R Larson, Layton & Sons LLC, Linda C Lewis, Rosanna E Lopez, Dale S Lunt, Gerald Ray Lunt, Jeane N Lunt, Jennifer B Lunt, John B Lunt, Julee Ann Lunt, Lucia Lunt, Merelene T Lunt, Nelson B Lunt, Samuel Lee Lunt, Lunt's Dairy, M N LLC, Nedra MacLay, North Shore River Side LLC, Karyn Norton, Marion S Pina, Mary L Price, Jana L Reed, Richard Reed, Linda S Reeves, Melvyn K Reeves, Leon J Reynolds, Janell Richins, Sammie M Roden, Diane Rowley, Larry D Rowley, Alma M Saline, Sanford L Saline, Daniel Sanchez, Francisco R Serna, Marlene N Serna, Joyce T Skinner, Lynn W Skinner, Sammy L Smith, Charlene L Stacy, Dennis E Stacy, Douglas D Stacy, Linda M Stacy, Priscilla O Starkweather, Robert R Starkweather, Lorenz Thelen, Nancy A Thelen, Janette B Tyler, Mervin J Wilhelm, Roxanne Wilhelm. (Brown, David)
April 22, 2020 Filing 142 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Cunningham Properties Limited Partnership on 4/13/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 21, 2020 Filing 141 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Andrew A. Gomez on 04/10/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 21, 2020 Filing 140 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Marilyn P. Larson on 04/09/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 21, 2020 Filing 139 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Gregory R. Larson on 04/09/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 21, 2020 Filing 138 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Linda S. Reeves on 04/17/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 21, 2020 Filing 137 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Melvyn K. Reeves on 04/17/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER GRANTING #135 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS ORDERED the deadline for Moving Defendants to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until 5/26/20. The deadline to Answer for any other Defendant who files a notice of appearance in this matter within 21 days of being served with the Complaint is extended until 5/26/20. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 4/20/20. (BAC)
April 17, 2020 Filing 135 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by Blanca E Bowman, Gilligan O Bowman, Sara C Bowman, Terry O Bowman, Scott K Bryce, Wendy K Bryce, Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Kenneth S Claridge, Betty J Clonts, Tommy C Clonts, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Curtis Canal Company of the Gila Valley Irrigation District, Duncan Unified School District No. 2, Freeport-McMoran Safford Incorporated, Ft Thomas Unified School District No 7, Gila Valley Irrigation District, Graham County Community College District, Keith Hansen, Margaret Elizabeth Hansen, Elizabeth Hinton, Max T Hinton, Householder Family Limited Partnership, Colleen M Lunt, Richard G Lunt. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, David)
April 17, 2020 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by David Albert Brown on behalf of Blanca E Bowman, Gilligan O Bowman, Sara C Bowman, Terry O Bowman, Scott K Bryce, Wendy K Bryce, Kenneth S Claridge, Betty J Clonts, Tommy C Clonts, Curtis Canal Company of the Gila Valley Irrigation District, Gila Valley Irrigation District, Keith Hansen, Margaret Elizabeth Hansen, Elizabeth Hinton, Max T Hinton, Householder Family Limited Partnership, Colleen M Lunt, Richard G Lunt. (Brown, David)
April 17, 2020 Filing 133 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Lorenz Thelen on 04/10/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 17, 2020 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Thomas Hood on behalf of Freeport-McMoran Safford Incorporated. (Hood, Sean)
April 17, 2020 Filing 131 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Nancy A. Thelen on 04/10/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 17, 2020 Filing 130 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Diane Rowley on 04/10/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 17, 2020 Filing 129 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Larry D. Rowley on 04/10/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 17, 2020 Filing 128 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Robert K. Lundell on 04/14/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 17, 2020 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by Riley Squire Snow on behalf of Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (Snow, Riley)
April 17, 2020 Filing 126 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Donna R. Burden on 04/15/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 17, 2020 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Scott Welker on behalf of Duncan Unified School District No. 2, Ft Thomas Unified School District No 7, Graham County Community College District. (Welker, Christopher)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER GRANTING #121 Motion to Allow Electronic Filing as to Catherine M Corum. The party is required to complete the Electronic Case File Registration form to register as a user with the Clerk's Office and to register as a subscriber to PACER (Public Access to Electronic Records) within five (5) days of the date of this Order. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 4/15/20. (BAC)
April 13, 2020 Filing 123 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Lawrence K. McGarry on 04/11/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 13, 2020 Filing 122 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Rosanna E. Lopez on 04/06/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 10, 2020 Filing 121 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Catherine M Corum. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(BAC)
April 9, 2020 Filing 120 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Town of Duncan, a Municipal Corporation on 04/09/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 9, 2020 Filing 119 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Clarice H. Holder on 04/09/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 9, 2020 Filing 118 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon James F. Holder on 04/09/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 9, 2020 Filing 117 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Leon J. Reynolds on 04/09/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 9, 2020 Filing 116 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Richard W. Clark on 04/09/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 9, 2020 Filing 115 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon John R. Carabeo on 04/09/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 9, 2020 Filing 114 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Dawn Carabeo on 04/09/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 113 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Tommy C. Clonts on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 112 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Marion S. Pina on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 111 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Ruth Bible on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 110 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Norma G. Henderson on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 109 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Alice M. Ellsworth on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 108 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Monica B. Hancock on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 107 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Jace L. Hancock on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 106 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon North Shore River Side L.L.C. on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 105 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Lynn W. Skinner on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 104 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Joyce T. Skinner on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 103 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Sam M. Angle on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 102 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Graham County Community College District on 04/06/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 101 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Mt. Graham Regional Medical Center, Inc. on 04/07/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 100 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Scott K. Bryce on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 99 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Wendy K. Bryce on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 98 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Mervin J. Wilhelm on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 97 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Roxanne Wilhelm on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 96 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Jeffrey B. Larson on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 95 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Lance Layton on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 94 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Sherri Layton on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 93 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Stephanie Howard on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 92 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Jason Howard on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 91 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Wilbur H. Lunt on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 90 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Marian R. Lunt on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 89 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Charlene L. Stacy on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 88 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Dennis E. Stacy on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 87 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Douglas D. Stacy on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 86 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Linda M. Stacy on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 85 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Sammie M. Roden on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 84 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Sheila Bodine on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 83 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Daniel Bodine on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 82 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Gary D. Bowen on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 8, 2020 Filing 81 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Janette B. Tyler on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 7, 2020 Filing 80 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Molli A. Haught on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 7, 2020 Filing 79 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Tom L. Haught on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 7, 2020 Filing 78 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon William Cull on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 7, 2020 Filing 77 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Kenneth B. Harrington on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 7, 2020 Filing 76 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Jana L. Reed on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 7, 2020 Filing 75 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon John L. Lacey on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 7, 2020 Filing 74 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Danny Carrell on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 7, 2020 Filing 73 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Richard A. Reed on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 7, 2020 Filing 72 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Marlene N. Serna on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 7, 2020 Filing 71 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Francisco R. Serna on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 7, 2020 Filing 70 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Robert R. Starkweather on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 7, 2020 Filing 69 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Priscilla O. Starkweather on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 7, 2020 Filing 68 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Amanda D. Conyer on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 7, 2020 Filing 67 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Daniel Sanchez on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 7, 2020 Filing 66 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Mary L. Price on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 7, 2020 Filing 65 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Ralph E. Harris on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 7, 2020 Filing 64 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Marcella D. Harris on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 7, 2020 Filing 63 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Richard M. Kaler on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 7, 2020 Filing 62 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Dee L. Hancock on 04/06/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 7, 2020 Filing 61 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Geronimo FRC, LLC on 04/06/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 7, 2020 Filing 60 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Mt. Graham Hospital District on 04/06/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 7, 2020 Filing 59 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Lynn M. Hancock on 04/06/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 7, 2020 Filing 58 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Gila Valley Irrigation District on 04/06/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 7, 2020 Filing 57 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Curtis Canal Company of the Gila Valley Irrigation District on 04/06/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 7, 2020 Filing 56 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Nelson B. Lunt on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 55 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Myrna J. Curtis on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 54 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Catherine M. Corum on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 53 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Betty J. Clonts on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 52 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Denise Brooks on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 51 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Janell Richins on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 50 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Colleen M. Lunt on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 49 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Richard G. Lunt on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 48 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Dale S. Lunt on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 47 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Keith Hansen on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 46 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Margaret Elizabeth Hansen on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 45 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Lunt's Dairy on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 44 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon John B. Lunt on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 43 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Merelene T. Lunt on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 42 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Jennifer B. Lunt on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 41 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Bradley E. Boyd on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 40 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Lucia Lunt on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 39 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Gerald Ray Lunt on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 38 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Julee Ann Lunt on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 37 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Samuel Lee Lunt on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 36 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Jeane N. Lunt on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 35 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Blanca E. Bowman on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 34 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Gilligan O. Bowman on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 33 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Sara C. Bowman on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 32 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Terry O. Bowman on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 31 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Elizabeth Hinton on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 30 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Max T. Hinton on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 29 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Kenneth S. Claridge on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 28 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Jay D. Colvin on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 27 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Brenda K. Colvin on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 26 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Brenda Hinton Harvey on 04/03/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 25 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Edwin J. Busby on 04/03/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 24 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon M N LLC on 04/05/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 23 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Linda C. Lewis on 04/03/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 22 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Janice Munson on 04/03/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 21 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Franklin B. Ross on 04/04/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 20 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints on 04/02/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 19 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Core Ag, LLC on 04/02/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 18 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Freeport-McMoran Safford Inc. on 04/02/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 17 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Kaler Ranch, LLC on 04/02/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Layton & Sons, LLC on 04/02/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 6, 2020 Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gila River Indian Community: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint with Exhibit A, MIDP Notice upon Nedra Maclay on 04/02/2020. (Godfrey, Merrill)
April 1, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Margaret Elizabeth Hansen. (BJWI). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 30, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this Case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge Rosemary Marquez. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-20-103-TUC-RM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
March 30, 2020 Filing 12 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
March 30, 2020 Filing 11 *Entered in error - All text associated with this entry has been removed. *Modified on 3/31/2020 party agreed to District Judge (DLC).
March 27, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Election Form Deadline resent to Plaintiff x2. (DLC)
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Sammie M Roden. (LML). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Leon J Reynolds, Janell Richins, Franklin B Ross, Diane Rowley, Larry D Rowley, Alma M Saline, Sanford L Saline, Francisco R Serna, Marlene N Serna, Kim Sherwood, Matthew Sherwood, Joyce T Skinner, Lynn W Skinner, Sammy L Smith, Charlene L Stacy, Dennis E Stacy, Douglas D Stacy, Linda M Stacy, Priscilla O Starkweather, Robert R Starkweather, Jacob E Starr, Marilyn A Starr, Thatcher 910 LLC, Lorenz Thelen, Nancy A Thelen, Janette B Tyler, Mervin J Wilhelm, Roxanne Wilhelm. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons)(LML). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. Modified on 3/27/2020 (LML). Modified on 3/27/2020 to remove defendant names to which summons were not submitted (LML).
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to 99 Ranch LLC, Sam M Angle, Marcelino M Aragon, Ruth Bible, Daniel Bodine, Sheila Bodine, Gary D Bowen, Blanca E Bowman, Gilligan O Bowman, Sara C Bowman, Terry O Bowman, Bradley E Boyd, Denise Brooks, Barbara L Bryce, Gary A Bryce, Scott K Bryce, Wendy K Bryce, Donna R Burden, Edwin J Busby, Kelly D Cambern, Joe B Cannon, Dawn Carabeo, John R Carabeo, Danny Carrell, Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Kenneth S Claridge, Richard W Clark, Betty J Clonts, Tommy C Clonts, Brenda K Colvin, Gary R Colvin, Jay D Colvin, Amanda D Conyer, Core Ag, LLC and/or Nopal Cactus Farms LLC, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Catherine M Corum, William Cull, Cunningham Properties Limited Partnership, Myrna J Curtis, Curtis Canal Company of the Gila Valley Irrigation District, DMMK FP LLC, Duncan Unified School District No. 2, Duncan, Town of, Alice M Ellsworth, Freeport-McMoran Safford Incorporated, Ft Thomas Unified School District No 7, Geronimo FRC LLC, Gila Valley Irrigation District, Jimmie G Gomez, Kay A Goodman, Matthew M Goodman, Graham County Community College District, Dee L Hancock, Jace Hancock, John C Hancock, Lynn M Hancock, Monica B Hancock, Keith Hansen, Margaret Elizabeth Hansen, Kenneth B Harrington, Marcella D Harris, Ralph E Harris, Brenda Hinton Harvey, Molli A Haught, Tom L Haught, Norma G Henderson, Elizabeth Hinton, Max T Hinton, Dalia M Hirko, Clarice H Holder, James F Holder, The Householder Family Limited Partnership, Jason Howard, Stephanie Howard, Richard M Kaler, Kaler Ranch LLC, John L Lacey, Karen M Lacey, Gregory R Larson, Jeffrey B Larson, Marilyn P Larson, Lance Layton, Sherri Layton, Layton & Sons LLC, Linda C Lewis, Rosanna E Lopez, Robert K Lundell, Colleen M. Lunt, Dale S Lunt, Gerald Ray Lunt, Jeane N. Lunt, Jennifer B Lunt, John B Lunt, Julee Ann Lunt, Lucia Lunt, Marian R Lunt, Merelene T Lunt, Nelson B Lunt, Richard G Lunt, Samuel Lee Lunt, Wilbur H Lunt, Lunt's Dairy, M N LLC, Nedra MacLay, Lawrence K McGarry, Alex E Morales Jr., Mt. Graham Hospital District, Mt. Graham Regional Medical Center Incorporated, Janice Munson, North Shore River Side LLC, Karyn Norton, Marion S Pina, Mary L Price, Jana L Reed, Richard Reed, Linda S Reeves, Melvyn K Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons, #34 Summons, #35 Summons, #36 Summons, #37 Summons, #38 Summons, #39 Summons, #40 Summons, #41 Summons, #42 Summons, #43 Summons, #44 Summons, #45 Summons, #46 Summons, #47 Summons, #48 Summons, #49 Summons, #50 Summons, #51 Summons, #52 Summons, #53 Summons, #54 Summons, #55 Summons, #56 Summons, #57 Summons, #58 Summons, #59 Summons, #60 Summons, #61 Summons, #62 Summons, #63 Summons, #64 Summons, #65 Summons, #66 Summons, #67 Summons, #68 Summons, #69 Summons, #70 Summons, #71 Summons, #72 Summons, #73 Summons, #74 Summons, #75 Summons, #76 Summons, #77 Summons, #78 Summons, #79 Summons, #80 Summons, #81 Summons, #82 Summons, #83 Summons, #84 Summons, #85 Summons, #86 Summons, #87 Summons, #88 Summons, #89 Summons, #90 Summons, #91 Summons, #92 Summons, #93 Summons, #94 Summons, #95 Summons, #96 Summons, #97 Summons, #98 Summons, #99 Summons, #100 Summons, #101 Summons, #102 Summons, #103 Summons, #104 Summons, #105 Summons, #106 Summons, #107 Summons, #108 Summons, #109 Summons, #110 Summons, #111 Summons, #112 Summons, #113 Summons, #114 Summons, #115 Summons, #116 Summons, #117 Summons, #118 Summons, #119 Summons)(LML). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. Modified on 3/23/2020 to include all appropriate parties (LML).
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Submitted by Gila River Indian Community. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons)(Godfrey, Merrill)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Gila River Indian Community. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons, #34 Summons, #35 Summons, #36 Summons, #37 Summons, #38 Summons, #39 Summons, #40 Summons, #41 Summons, #42 Summons, #43 Summons, #44 Summons, #45 Summons, #46 Summons, #47 Summons, #48 Summons, #49 Summons, #50 Summons, #51 Summons, #52 Summons, #53 Summons, #54 Summons, #55 Summons, #56 Summons, #57 Summons, #58 Summons, #59 Summons, #60 Summons, #61 Summons, #62 Summons, #63 Summons, #64 Summons, #65 Summons, #66 Summons, #67 Summons, #68 Summons, #69 Summons, #70 Summons, #71 Summons, #72 Summons, #73 Summons, #74 Summons, #75 Summons, #76 Summons, #77 Summons, #78 Summons, #79 Summons, #80 Summons, #81 Summons, #82 Summons, #83 Summons, #84 Summons, #85 Summons, #86 Summons, #87 Summons, #88 Summons, #89 Summons, #90 Summons, #91 Summons, #92 Summons, #93 Summons, #94 Summons, #95 Summons, #96 Summons, #97 Summons, #98 Summons, #99 Summons, #100 Summons, #101 Summons, #102 Summons, #103 Summons, #104 Summons, #105 Summons, #106 Summons, #107 Summons, #108 Summons, #109 Summons, #110 Summons, #111 Summons, #112 Summons, #113 Summons, #114 Summons, #115 Summons, #116 Summons, #117 Summons, #118 Summons, #119 Summons)(Godfrey, Merrill)
March 13, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Donald R Pongrace and Merrill C Godfrey on behalf of Plaintiff Gila River Indian Community. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18054357. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eric J Markovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00103-TUC-EJM. Magistrate Election form attached.(BAC)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18054357 filed by Gila River Indian Community.(Godfrey, Merrill) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A part, #3 Exhibit A part 2, #4 Exhibit A part 3, #5 Exhibit A part 4, #6 Exhibit A part 5, #7 Exhibit A part 6, #8 Exhibit A part 7, #9 Exhibit A part 8, #10 Exhibit A part 9, #11 Exhibit A part 10, #12 Exhibit A part 11)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gila River Indian Community v. 99 Ranch LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M N LLC
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M Kaler
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco R Serna
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Bible
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Householder Family, Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott K Bryce
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Rowley
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Bodine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaler Ranch LLC
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blanca E Bowman
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert K Lundell
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marian R Lunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorenz Thelen
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Canal Company of the Gila Valley Irrigation District
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcella D Harris
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn A Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy C Clonts
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine M Corum
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ft Thomas Unified School District No 7
Represented By: Christopher Scott Welker
Represented By: Richard Rae Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth S Claridge
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Thelen
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Lee Lunt
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janette B Tyler
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley E Boyd
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale S Lunt
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri Layton
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice M Ellsworth
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxanne Wilhelm
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer B Lunt
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam M Angle
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nedra MacLay
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda C Lewis
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosanna E Lopez
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints
Represented By: Riley Squire Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Hinton
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucia Lunt
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham County Community College District
Represented By: Christopher Scott Welker
Represented By: Richard Rae Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary R Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay D Colvin
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay A Goodman
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom L Haught
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L Lacey
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry O Bowman
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew M Goodman
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Munson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph E Harris
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe B Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon J Reynolds
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Layton & Sons LLC
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard W Clark
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary L Price
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Brooks
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry D Rowley
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mervin J Wilhelm
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lunt's Dairy
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cunningham Properties Limited Partnership
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core Ag, LLC and/or Nopal Cactus Farms LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Sanchez
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard G Lunt
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda D Conyer
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 99 Ranch LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janell Richins
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica B Hancock
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion S Pina
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen M. Lunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alma M Saline
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duncan, Town of
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara C Bowman
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcelino M Aragon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna R Burden
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn P Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Ray Lunt
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur H Lunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dee L Hancock
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce T Skinner
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Bodine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Hinton Harvey
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda K Colvin
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex E Morales Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priscilla O Starkweather
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gila Valley Irrigation District
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey B Larson
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Carrell
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jace Hancock
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mt. Graham Hospital District
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max T Hinton
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeane N. Lunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlene N Serna
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn M Hancock
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Howard
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myrna J Curtis
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy K Bryce
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly D Cambern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sammy L Smith
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlene L Stacy
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda M Stacy
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda S Reeves
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julee Ann Lunt
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Carabeo
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence K McGarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molli A Haught
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints
Represented By: Riley Squire Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen M Lacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson B Lunt
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jana L Reed
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanford L Saline
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilligan O Bowman
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary D Bowen
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmie G Gomez
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thatcher 910 LLC
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary A Bryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMMK FP LLC
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Elizabeth Hansen
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn W Skinner
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: Riley Squire Snow
Represented By: Christopher Scott Welker
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sammie M Roden
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John B Lunt
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R Carabeo
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth B Harrington
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeport-McMoran Safford Incorporated
Represented By: Sean Thomas Hood
Represented By: Bradley John Pew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin B Ross
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duncan Unified School District No. 2
Represented By: Christopher Scott Welker
Represented By: Richard Rae Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Layton
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas D Stacy
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Hansen
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mt. Graham Regional Medical Center Incorporated
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Cull
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geronimo FRC LLC
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma G Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karyn Norton
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Shore River Side LLC
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarice H Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara L Bryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis E Stacy
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert R Starkweather
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvyn K Reeves
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty J Clonts
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory R Larson
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin J Busby
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Reed
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Howard
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob E Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merelene T Lunt
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dalia M Hirko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core Ag LLC
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex E Morales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeane N Lunt
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nopal Cactus Farms LLC
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen M Lunt
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Householder Family Limited Partnership
Represented By: Garrett Wilford Perkins
Represented By: David Albert Brown
Represented By: J Albert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gila River Indian Community
Represented By: Jason Travis Hauter
Represented By: Linus Everling
Represented By: Thomas L Murphy
Represented By: Merrill C Godfrey
Represented By: Donald R Pongrace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?