Western Watersheds Project et al v. Feldhausen et al
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project, Sierra Club and Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management, Anthony Scott Feldhausen and Raymond Suazo
Case Number: 4:2020cv00149
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Jennifer G Zipps
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Stipulation: Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint on or before June 22, 2020, and Defendants shall file an answer or other response within 60 days from being served with Plaintiffs' amended complaint. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 6/5/2020. (MCO)
June 2, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION Concerning Filing of Amended Complaint and Time to Answer (First Request) by Bureau of Land Management, Anthony Scott Feldhausen, Raymond Suazo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turcke, Paul)
April 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Paul A. Turcke appearing for Bureau of Land Management, Anthony Scott Feldhausen, Raymond Suazo. . (Turcke, Paul)
April 10, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Todd Christopher Tucci and Elizabeth Hunter Potter on behalf of Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Sierra Club, and Western Watersheds Project. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 7, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Biological Diversity, Sierra Club, Western Watersheds Project. (Tucci, Todd)
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 *Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 - NOTICE of Errata re: 5 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Notice of Filing Automated Civil Action Cover Sheet by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Sierra Club, Western Watersheds Project. (Tucci, Todd) *Modified on 4/8/2020, to correct event type and to correct reference to related document. (MCO).
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Bureau of Land Management, Anthony Scott Feldhausen, Raymond Suazo. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Western Watersheds Project, Center for Biological Diversity, Sierra Club. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18153583. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jennifer G Zipps. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-149-TUC-JGZ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Center for Biological Diversity, Sierra Club, Western Watersheds Project. (Tucci, Todd) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18153583 filed by Western Watersheds Project, Sierra Club, Center for Biological Diversity. (Tucci, Todd) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Watersheds Project et al v. Feldhausen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Paul A Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Scott Feldhausen
Represented By: Paul A Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Suazo
Represented By: Paul A Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: Elizabeth Hunter Potter
Represented By: Todd Christopher Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Elizabeth Hunter Potter
Represented By: Todd Christopher Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Elizabeth Hunter Potter
Represented By: Todd Christopher Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?