Parker et al v. Alfa Laval Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: David Parker and Sharon Parker
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company, BW/IP International Incorporated, Pfizer Incorporated, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Ford Motor Company, Mack Trucks Incorporated, William Powell Company, Warren Pumps LLC, Huntington Ingalls Industries Incorporated, NAPA, John Crane Incorporated, Elliott Company, Morse Tec LLC, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Sherwin-Williams Company, SPX Corporation, General Electric Company, Holley Performance Products Incorporated, Honeywell International Incorporated, Benjamin Moore & Company, O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC, Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated, Viad Corporation, RT Vanderbilt Holding Company Incorporated, DCO LLC, IMO Industries Incorporated, Armstrong International Incorporated, Viacomcbs Incorporated, Tuthill Corporation, Flowserve US Incorporated, Alfa Laval Incorporated, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, National Automotive Parts Association LLC, FMC Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals LLC, DAP Products Incorported, AutoZone Incorporated, Hennessy Industries Incorporated, Union Carbide Corporation, Caterpillar Incorporated, Dunn-Edwards Corporation, Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Hopeman Brothers Incorporated, Kinney Vacuum Company, Elliott Company formerly known as Elliott Turbomachinery Company doing business as Elliott Turbomachinery Company, Elliott Turbomachinery Company, Viacom Incorporated, Northern Fire Apparatus Company, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Dana Companies LLC, Atwood & Morrill, Huntington Ingalls Industries Incorporated doing business as Northrop Grummon Ship Systems Incorporated doing business as Newport News Shipbuilding and Dry Dock Company, Allied-Signal Incorporated, CBS Corporation, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated sued individually and formerly doing business as Northrop Grummon Ship Systems Incorporated, Dial Corporation and National Automotive Parts Association
Case Number: 4:2020cv00174
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Raner C Collins
Referring Judge: D Thomas Ferraro
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Defendant Crane's #7 Administrative Motion is DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE cases 4:20-cv-174 and 4:20-cv-175. Defendants Huntington Ingalls, Incorporated and Alfa Laval, Incorporated shall refile their Motions to Dismiss under case number 4:20-cv-172 within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 5/27/20. Associated Cases: 4:20-cv-00172-RCC, 4:20-cv-00174-RCC, 4:20-cv-00175-RCC (BAC)
May 22, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant John Crane Incorporated. (Williams, James)
May 22, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. (Maraz, Thomas)
May 21, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Mack Trucks Incorporated. (Ionescu, Claudia)
May 21, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant General Electric Company. (Roberts, Daniel)
May 21, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #43 Answer to Complaint filed by William Powell Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document(s) signed by attorney Tom Shorall but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Jason Boblick. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MYE)
May 20, 2020 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by William Powell Company identifying Corporate Parent William Powell Company for William Powell Company. (Boblick, Jason)
May 20, 2020 Filing 43 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by William Powell Company.(Boblick, Jason)
May 20, 2020 Filing 42 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Morse Tec LLC. (Shorall, Thomas) *Modified to reflect correct filer on 5/21/2020 (MYE).
May 19, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia V Waterkotte on behalf of Tuthill Corporation. (Waterkotte, Patricia)
May 18, 2020 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust. (Mear, Richard)
May 18, 2020 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust. (Mear, Richard)
May 15, 2020 Filing 38 Defendant Morse TEC, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Morse Tec LLC.(Shorall, Thomas)
May 15, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by David Parker, Sharon Parker. Party Huntington Ingalls Industries Incorporated terminated. (Sethi, Dev)
May 14, 2020 Remark: Out of state attorney Jordan Blumenfeld-James removed as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 13, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by William Lee Thorpe on behalf of Huntington Ingalls Industries Incorporated. (Thorpe, William)
May 11, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by David Parker, Sharon Parker. Party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company terminated. (Sethi, Dev)
May 8, 2020 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company. (Larsen, Dan)
May 8, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Alexandra Brisky Cunningham on behalf of Defendant Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 8, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Dan R Larsen on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 8, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn Michael Petri on behalf of DCO LLC, Union Carbide Corporation, Vanderbilt Minerals LLC. (Petri, Shawn)
May 7, 2020 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Genuine Parts Company identifying Corporate Parent Genuine Parts Company for Genuine Parts Company. (Mear, Richard)
May 7, 2020 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPX Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Kinney Pump Company for SPX Corporation. (Crown, Larry)
May 7, 2020 Filing 27 Separate ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand (Plaintiff's Original Complaint) by SPX Corporation.(Crown, Larry)
May 6, 2020 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Roberts, Daniel)
May 6, 2020 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FMC Corporation. (Crown, Larry)
May 6, 2020 Filing 24 Separate ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand (Plaintiff's Original Complaint) by FMC Corporation.(Crown, Larry)
May 6, 2020 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. (Maraz, Thomas)
May 5, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caterpillar Incorporated. (Crown, Larry)
May 5, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mack Trucks Incorporated. (Warren, Jeffrey)
May 5, 2020 Filing 18 Separate ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand (Plaintiff's Original Complaint) by Caterpillar Incorporated.(Crown, Larry)
May 1, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE re: Notice of Filing by John Crane Incorporated Defendant John Crane Inc.'s Notice of Filing Notice of Removal and Answer in Case 4:20-CV-00175-DCB. (Williams, James)
May 1, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Crane Incorporated. (Williams, James)
April 30, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this Case is reassigned by random draw to Senior Judge Raner C Collins. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-20-00174-TUC-RCC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
April 30, 2020 Filing 15 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
April 29, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction -Personal by Alfa Laval Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Thorpe, William)
April 29, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction -Personal by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Thorpe, William)
April 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE re: Service to Other Parties Re Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re: #3 New Case Opened . (Thorpe, William)
April 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE re: Supplemental Service by Alfa Laval Incorporated . (Thorpe, William)
April 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE re: Supplemental Service by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated . (Thorpe, William)
April 24, 2020 Filing 7 *First MOTION to Transfer Related Case Defendant John Crane Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related by John Crane Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: 4:20-cv-00172-JR, 4:20-cv-00174-DTF, 4:20-cv-00175-DCB) (Williams, James) *Modified to reflect document filed with incorrect case number on 4/27/2020 (MYE).
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 *Joinder re: #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Alfa Laval Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and Index, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Thorpe, William) *Modified to add attorney on 4/24/2020 (MYE).
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to AutoZone Incorporated, Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Ford Motor Company, General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Mack Trucks Incorporated, and Pfizer Incorporated (DLC) *Modified on 4/23/2020 to remove parties not subject to this Notice (DLC).
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18208264. This case has been assigned to the Honorable D. Thomas Ferraro. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-174-TUC-DTF. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (DLC)
April 22, 2020 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED*** ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by AutoZone Incorporated, Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust/former Vellumoid Division, Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust/Felt Products Manufacturing Company, Ford Motor Company, General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Mack Trucks Incorporated, and Pfizer Incorporated. (Originals file in Pima County Superior Court between 3/30/2020 - 4/15/2020)(DLC) *Modified on 4/23/2020 to remove no-answer parties(DLC).
April 22, 2020 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Rule102(A) Fastar Certificate upon Viad Corporation and Cyprus Amax Minerals Company on 3/20/2020. (Originals filed in Pima Superior Court on 3/24/2020). Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Rule102(A) Fastar Certificate upon RT Vanderbilt Holding Company Incorporated, O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC, Morse Tec LLC,IMO Industries Incorporated, Warren Pumps LLC, Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Tuthill Corporation, DAP Products, Viacomcbs Incorporated, Holley-Performance Products Incorporated, BW/IP International Incorporated, Hennessy Industries Incorporated, Elliott Company, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Huntington Ingalls Industries Incorporated on 3/24/2020. Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Rule102(A) Fastar Certificate upon William Powell on 3/26/2020. Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Rule102(A) Fastar Certificate upon Vanderbilt Minerals LLC on 3/27/2020. Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Rule102(A) Fastar Certificate upon Sherwin-Williams Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Honeywell International Incorporated, Union Carbide Corporation, SPX Corporation, Pfizer Incorporated, Mack Trucks Incorporated, John Crane Incorporated, Genuine Parts Company, General Electric Company, Ford Motor Company, FMC Corporation, Flowserve US Incorporated, Benjamin Moore & Company, Dunn-Edwards Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Alfa Laval Incorporated, Caterpillar Incorporated, Autozone Incorporated on 3/25/2020. (Originals filed in Pima Superior Court on 4/6/2020)Proof of Service for Armstrong International Incorporated on 3/30/2020. Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint upon DCO LLC and Hopeman Brothers Incorporated on 3/26/2020. Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Fastar Certificate upon National Automotive Parts Association LLC on 3/30/2020. Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint upon Weir Avlves & Controls USA Incorporated on 4/3/2020. (Originals filed in Pima Superior Court on 4/20/2020) (DLC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Thorpe, William) (DLC)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20201347. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18208264 filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Thorpe, William) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet part 2, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit Declaration of David P Sargent Jr)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker et al v. Alfa Laval Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Victoria Renee Kelly
Represented By: Richard Wayne Mear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP International Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Incorporated
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Dan R Larsen
Represented By: Brett L Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mack Trucks Incorporated
Represented By: Jeffrey Carl Warren
Represented By: Claudia Carla Ionescu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Powell Company
Represented By: Thomas J Shorall, Jr.
Represented By: Jason James Boblick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Industries Incorporated
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAPA
Represented By: Victoria Renee Kelly
Represented By: Richard Wayne Mear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Incorporated
Represented By: James Lawrence Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morse Tec LLC
Represented By: Thomas J Shorall, Jr.
Represented By: Jason James Boblick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Represented By: Alexandra Brisky Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherwin-Williams Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Jeremy Arian Lite
Represented By: Daniel Geary Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holley Performance Products Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Moore & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company
Represented By: Lauren Ann Crawford
Represented By: Thomas A Maraz
Represented By: Chelsea L Gulinson
Represented By: Chelsea Leah Gulinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corporation
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RT Vanderbilt Holding Company Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCO LLC
Represented By: Shawn Michael Petri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacomcbs Incorporated
Represented By: Stephen M Bressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tuthill Corporation
Represented By: Patricia V Waterkotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval Incorporated
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Automotive Parts Association LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Elan Shai Mizrahi
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanderbilt Minerals LLC
Represented By: Shawn Michael Petri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAP Products Incorported
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone Incorporated
Represented By: Carol Marie Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennessy Industries Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Shawn Michael Petri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Incorporated
Represented By: Elan Shai Mizrahi
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunn-Edwards Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust
Represented By: Victoria Renee Kelly
Represented By: Richard Wayne Mear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinney Vacuum Company
Represented By: Elan Shai Mizrahi
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company formerly known as Elliott Turbomachinery Company doing business as Elliott Turbomachinery Company
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Turbomachinery Company
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Incorporated
Represented By: Stephen M Bressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Fire Apparatus Company
Represented By: Elan Shai Mizrahi
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Stephen M Bressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies LLC
Represented By: Shawn Michael Petri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Industries Incorporated doing business as Northrop Grummon Ship Systems Incorporated doing business as Newport News Shipbuilding and Dry Dock Company
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied-Signal Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Stephen M Bressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated sued individually and formerly doing business as Northrop Grummon Ship Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Represented By: Alexandra Brisky Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dial Corporation
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Automotive Parts Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Parker
Represented By: Dev Kumar Sethi
Represented By: Jordan Blumenfeld-James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Parker
Represented By: Dev Kumar Sethi
Represented By: Jordan Blumenfeld-James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?