Carrera v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Ramona Leticia Carrera
Defendant: Unknown Parties, United States of America, El Rio Foundation Incorporated and El Rio Foundation Incorporated doing business as El Rio Health
Case Number: 4:2020cv00195
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Raner C Collins
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ramona Leticia Carrera: Certified Mail Receipt re: Complaint, Summons upon USA on 06/12/2020. (Kimmel, Lisa)
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ramona Leticia Carrera: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint, Summons upon United States of America on 05/26/2020. (Kimmel, Lisa)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ramona Leticia Carrera: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint, Summons upon El Rio Foundation on 05/26/2020. (Kimmel, Lisa)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Ramona Leticia Carrera. Amendment to #1 Complaint Attorney Certification. (Kimmel, Lisa)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to El Rio Foundation Incorporated, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18249411. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Senior Judge Raner C Collins. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00195-TUC-RCC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Ramona Leticia Carrera. (Kimmel, Lisa) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAC)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18249411 filed by Ramona Leticia Carrera. (Kimmel, Lisa) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Atty Certification)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrera v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Rio Foundation Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Rio Foundation Incorporated doing business as El Rio Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Leticia Carrera
Represented By: Lisa Ann Kimmel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?