Patterson v. Ace Hardware Stores Incorporated
Plaintiff: Anthony Patterson
Defendant: Ace Hardware Stores Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2020cv00288
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: David C Bury
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED that the Motion for Referral for Settlement Conference (Doc. 8) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is set for a SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE before the Honorable Bruce G. Macdonald. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the settlement conference shall be telephonic, with the parties attending the settlement conference or having a representative with settlement authority attending the settlement conference. (Review attached ORDER for details). Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 8/27/2020. (MCO)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Anthony Patterson. (Stamps, Sesaly)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST re: Joint Referral for Magistrate by Plaintiff Anthony Patterson. (Stamps, Sesaly)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Pretrial Scheduling Conference is set for Thursday, September 10, 2020, at 10:00 am. The conference will be held telephonically with the Judge's law clerk, Greer Barkley. (Review ORDER for further details). Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 8/19/2020. (MCO)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 *REPORT of Rule 26(f) Joint Case Management Report and Proposed Discovery Plan by Anthony Patterson. (Stamps, Sesaly) *Modified on 8/18/2020, to correct docket text. (MCO).
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Ace Hardware Stores Incorporated. (Meynard, Cassandra)
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 * ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand re: #1 Notice of Removal by Ace Hardware Stores Incorporated.(Meynard, Cassandra)*Modified to correct reference to related document on 7/8/2020 (MFR).
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18443492. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David C Bury. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-288-TUC-DCB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
July 6, 2020 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Amended Complaint, Rule 102(A) FASTAR Certificate upon Ace Hardware Stores Inc. on 6/22/20. (Original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 6/23/20.) (MYE) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ace Hardware Stores Incorporated. (Meynard, Cassandra) (MYE)
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20201913. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18443492 filed by Ace Hardware Stores Incorporated. (Meynard, Cassandra) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Ace Hardware Stores Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Patterson
Represented By: Sesaly Ona Stamps
Represented By: Tyler H Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Hardware Stores Incorporated
Represented By: Cassandra Blythe Meynard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?