Bakker v. Cove Apartments
Plaintiff: Kathryn Elizabeth Bakker and Kathryn Elizabeth Bouchard
Defendant: Cove Apartments doing business as Cove RockStar Capital and Nationwide Evictions and Nationwide Eviction and Rockstar Capital Investments doing business as Cove
Case Number: 4:2020cv00299
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Cindy K Jorgenson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Kathryn Elizabeth Bakker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(BAC)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 *AMENDED COMPLAINT and EMERGENCY MOTION for Relief and SUMMARY JUDGMENT in Personal Injury Claim of Intentional Infliction of Financial, Emotional, and Mental Distress-Anxiety and Unlawful Eviction Suit During Federally Declared National Emergency against Nationwide Eviction and Rockstar Capital Investments filed by Kathryn Elizabeth Bakker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Attachment List, #12 Attachment 1, #13 Attachment 2, #14 Attachment 3, #15 Attachment 4, #16 Attachment 5, #17 Attachment 6, #18 Attachment 7, #19 Attachment 8, #20 Attachment 9)(BAC) *Modified to add motion part on 9/9/2020 (DLC).
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Kathryn Elizabeth Bakker: P.O. Box 35215, Tucson, AZ 85740. Parcels: 6281 N Oracle Rd., #35215, Tucson, AZ 85704 (MCO)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (DLC)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Cindy K Jorgenson. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00299-TUC-CKJ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Kathryn Elizabeth Bakker. (DLC)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Kathryn Elizabeth Bakker. (DLC)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kathryn Elizabeth Bakker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bakker v. Cove Apartments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cove Apartments doing business as Cove RockStar Capital and Nationwide Evictions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Eviction and Rockstar Capital Investments doing business as Cove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Elizabeth Bakker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Elizabeth Bouchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?