Sanchez v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Maria E Sanchez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2020cv00348
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: David C Bury
Referring Judge: Jacqueline M Rateau
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Carol Clark appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Clark, Carol)
September 2, 2020 NOTICE of request for e-notices by Michael A. Ambri. (Ambri, Michael)
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, Attorney General of the United States, and United States Attorney, District of AZ. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff may proceed without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefor. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau on 8/27/2020. (MCO)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED that this action is referred to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Jacqueline M. Rateau for all pretrial proceedings and Report and Recommendation in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future filings in this case shall be designated, as follows: CV-20-348-TUC DCB (JR). (Review attached ORDER for details). Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 8/19/2020. (MCO)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. Review attached ORDER for deadlines and procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau on 8/18/2020. (MCO)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this Case is reassigned by random draw to Senior Judge David C Bury. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-20-00348-TUC-DCB. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.(BAC)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jacqueline M Rateau. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-348-TUC-JR. Magistrate Election form attached. (DLC)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Maria E Sanchez. (Miller, Meghan) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DLC)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Maria E Sanchez. (Miller, Meghan) (DLC)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Maria E Sanchez. (Miller, Meghan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria E Sanchez
Represented By: Meghan McNamara Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Carol Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?