Railey v. Arizona, State of
Plaintiff: Belinda Railey
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Case Number: 4:2020cv00353
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Pro Se (Tucson)
Referring Judge: James A Soto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed 8/21/20, judgment of dismissal is entered, and the complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice.(BAC)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED Plaintiff Railey is dismissed. Johnny Ray Foster must, within 30 days of the filing date of this Order, either file an amended complaint using the court-approved form included with this Order, or file a response stating that he does not intend to file an amended complaint. Failure to comply will result in a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice, without further notice and denial of any pending unrelated motions as moot. Clerk must mail to Mr Foster, at the Arizona State Prison Complex-Eyman, a copy of this Order and a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 8/21/20.(BAC)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee received: $400, receipt number TUC032323. (BAC)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT by Belinda Railey. (SCA)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (SCA)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 *PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number TUC032323 filed by Belinda Railey. (52 pages)(SCA) *Modified to include number of pages submitted and to correct plaintiff's last name on 8/19/2020 (SCA). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2020: #1 CorrectedComplaint) (CEI). *Modified to indicate case number missing on main document; added corrected first page of complaint with case number on 8/20/2020 (CEI).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Railey v. Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Railey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?