Waters v. Von Blanckensee
Petitioner: Coty Travis Waters
Respondent: Barbara Von Blanckensee
Case Number: 4:2020cv00354
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Maria S Aguilera (PS)
Referring Judge: David C Bury
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 TIME SCHEDULE ORDER of USCA re: #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Coty Travis Waters. (Distributed by the 9th Circuit) (BAC)
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 USCA Case Number re: #6 Notice of Appeal. Case number 20-16847, 9th CCA. (Distributed by the 9th Circuit) (BAC)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of USCA re: #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Coty Travis Waters. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay $505 filing and docketing fees for this appeal to district court and file in this court proof of such payment, or file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to comply may result in dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. (Distributed by the 9th Circuit)(BAC)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #3 Order, #4 Clerk's Judgment by Coty Travis Waters. (BAC)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number TUC032401. (MYE)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed September 8, 2020, judgment of dismissal is entered. Petitioner to take nothing and this action is hereby dismissed. (MYE)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED Petitioner's Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 (Doc. 1) and this case are dismissed. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 9/4/20. (MYE)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (BAC)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) filed by Coty Travis Waters. (10 pages). (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waters v. Von Blanckensee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Coty Travis Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Barbara Von Blanckensee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?