Travis et al v. Assured Imaging LLC
Plaintiff: Geraldine Pineda, Kerri G Peters and Angela T Travis
Defendant: Assured Imaging LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00390
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John C Hinderaker
Referring Judge: Scott H Rash
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Due to the appointment of a new District Judge in the Tucson Division, this case is hereby reassigned by the Clerk to the Honorable District Judge John C Hinderaker. All future filings shall reflect the following case number CV 20-390-JCH.
October 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Assured Imaging LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Beauchamp, Keith)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that the Stipulation (Doc. #6 ) is granted. Defendant shall have through and including October 30, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 10/22/2020. (ARC)
October 12, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Assured Imaging LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beauchamp, Keith)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Kerri G Peters, Geraldine Pineda, Angela T Travis: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint Package upon Assured Imaging, LLC on 9/15/2020. (Robinovitch, Hart)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Assured Imaging LLC. (ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18657127. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Scott H Rash. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-390-TUC-SHR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Kerri G Peters, Geraldine Pineda, Angela T Travis. (Robinovitch, Hart) (ARC)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18657127 filed by Angela T Travis, Geraldine Pineda, Kerri G Peters. (Robinovitch, Hart) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travis et al v. Assured Imaging LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Pineda
Represented By: Hart Lawrence Robinovitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerri G Peters
Represented By: Hart Lawrence Robinovitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela T Travis
Represented By: Hart Lawrence Robinovitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assured Imaging LLC
Represented By: Keith Beauchamp
Represented By: David A Carney
Represented By: Shelley Tolman
Represented By: Paul Gregory Karlsgodt
Represented By: Marcus McCutcheon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?