Jance v. Homerun Offer LLC et al
Plaintiff: Josh M Jance
Defendant: Homerun Offer LLC, House Buyers USA LLC and All Star Investments LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00482
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Jennifer G Zipps
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff must file a response to Defendants' #19 Motion to Dismiss no later than 1/13/21. Defendants may file a reply within 15 days after service of Plaintiff's response. The Motion to Dismiss will be deemed ready for decision without oral argument on the day following the date set for filing a reply unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 12/15/20. (BAC)
December 14, 2020 Filing 20 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Certification Under Local Rule 12.1(c) by Defendants All Star Investments LLC, Homerun Offer LLC. (O'Neal, John)
December 14, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by All Star Investments LLC, Homerun Offer LLC. (O'Neal, John)
December 10, 2020 Filing 18 Exhibit A to Main Document re: #17 Notice (Other) by Plaintiff Josh M Jance. (BAC)
December 10, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE re: STIPULATION Regarding Pleading Amendment by Josh M Jance.(BAC)
December 3, 2020 Filing 16 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Star Investments LLC, Homerun Offer LLC filed by Josh M Jance.(BAC)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #12 Stipulation: IT IS ORDERED the parties' #12 Stipulation Regarding Pleading Amendment is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have until 12/4/20 to file a Second Amended Complaint. Defendants shall have 10 days from the date of service of the Second Amended Complaint to file an answer or otherwise respond. Plaintiff's #11 Motion for Alternative Service is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 11/17/20.(BAC)
November 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE re: Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Draft Stiuplation by Josh M Jance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(BAC)
November 17, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION Regarding Pleading Amendment by All Star Investments LLC, Homerun Offer LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(O'Neal, John)
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE re: Notice Re Response to Complaint by All Star Investments LLC, Homerun Offer LLC . (O'Neal, John)
November 12, 2020 Filing 13 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #11 MOTION by Plaintiff Josh M Jance. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(BAC)
November 12, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Alternative Service by Josh M Jance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(BAC)
November 5, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Josh M Jance. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (BAC)
November 5, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by All Star Investments LLC. (Nielsen, Benjamin)
November 5, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Homerun Offer LLC. (Nielsen, Benjamin)
November 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES: THE PARTIES ARE ADVISED that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 11/3/20.(BAC)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to All Star Investments LLC, Homerun Offer LLC. (ARC)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (ARC)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18841413. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jennifer G Zipps. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-482-TUC-JGZ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20203567. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18841413 filed by All Star Investments LLC, Homerun Offer LLC. (Nielsen, Benjamin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(ARC)
November 3, 2020 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Affidavit of Service re: Civil Summons, Civil Complaint, Statement of Facts, Demand for Relief, Applicable Law Supporting Claims, Rule 102(a) Fastar Certificate, Civil Cover Sheet upon Homerun Offer LLC, All Star Investments LLC on 8/31/2020. (Original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 9/10/2020); upon Home Buyers USA LLC on 9/4/2020. (Original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 9/9/2020) (ARC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
November 3, 2020 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** ANSWER to Complaint by House Buyers USA LLC. (Original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 9/21/2020)***ENTERED IN DISTRICT COURT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES***(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jance v. Homerun Offer LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homerun Offer LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Christian Nielsen
Represented By: John Maston O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: House Buyers USA LLC
Represented By: Brian Andrew Laird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Star Investments LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Christian Nielsen
Represented By: John Maston O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh M Jance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?