Kehoe et al v. Cochise County Community College District Governing Board et al
Plaintiff: John Michael Kehoe and Robert Michael Kirk
Defendant: Wendy Davis, Verlyn Fick, Cochise College, Cochise County Community College District Governing Board, J.D. Rottweiler, Cochise County Community College District and JD Rottweiler
Case Number: 4:2020cv00519
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Cindy K Jorgenson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Cochise County Community College District.(Staton, Georgia)
January 20, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Cochise County Community College District. (Staton, Georgia)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Due to a conflict with the Court's calendar, IT IS ORDERED the Rule 16 Case Management Conference, presently set February 2, 2021 at 11:00 AM is VACATED and ACCLERATED to FEBRUARY 1, 2021 AT 11:00 AM before this Court. The conference will be held telephonically. The parties shall call 866-390-1828 a few minutes before the time of the hearing. The access code is 2905535. Ordered by Senior Judge Cindy K. Jorgenson. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGF)
January 20, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by John Michael Kehoe, Robert Michael Kirk. (Cope, Thom)
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cochise County Community College District filed by Robert Michael Kirk, John Michael Kehoe.(Cope, Thom)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by John Michael Kehoe, Robert Michael Kirk . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cope, Thom)
January 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Thom K Cope. (Cope, Thom)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16, a Case Management Conference is set for February 2, 2021, at 11:00 a.m., before the Honorable Cindy K. Jorgenson. The conference will be held telephonically. IT IS ORDERED: The parties are directed to confer at least 21 days before the conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Counsel shall file with the Court, on or before January 26, 2021, a Joint Report reflecting the results of their meeting and outlining the discovery plan. (Review attached order for details). Signed by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 1/4/2021. (MCO)
November 25, 2020 Filing 4 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Cochise College, Cochise County Community College District Governing Board, Wendy Davis, Verlyn Fick, J.D. Rottweiler. (Staton, Georgia)
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Cochise College, Cochise County Community College District Governing Board, Wendy Davis, Verlyn Fick, J.D. Rottweiler.(Staton, Georgia)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18913533. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Cindy K Jorgenson. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-0519-TUC-CKJ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
November 24, 2020 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED: ANSWER to Original Complaint with Jury Demand by Cochise College, Cochise County Community College District Governing Board, Wendy Davis, Verlyn Fick, J.D. Rottweiler. ENTERED IN DISTRICT COURT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES***(MFR)
November 24, 2020 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Original Complaint and Certificae of Service upon J.D. Rottweiler, Wendy Davis, Verlyn Fick and Cochise County Community College District Governing Board on 10/7/2020 (original filed in Cochise County Superior Court on 10/9/2020. (MFR) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cochise County Superior Court, case number S0200CV202000481. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18913533 filed by Cochise County Community College District Governing Board, J.D. Rottweiler, Verlyn Fick, Wendy Davis, Cochise College. (Staton, Georgia) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Cochise County Superior Court File, #5 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kehoe et al v. Cochise County Community College District Governing Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Davis
Represented By: Ravi Vasishta Patel
Represented By: Georgia A Staton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verlyn Fick
Represented By: Ravi Vasishta Patel
Represented By: Georgia A Staton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cochise College
Represented By: Ravi Vasishta Patel
Represented By: Georgia A Staton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cochise County Community College District Governing Board
Represented By: Ravi Vasishta Patel
Represented By: Georgia A Staton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.D. Rottweiler
Represented By: Ravi Vasishta Patel
Represented By: Georgia A Staton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cochise County Community College District
Represented By: Ravi Vasishta Patel
Represented By: Georgia A Staton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JD Rottweiler
Represented By: Ravi Vasishta Patel
Represented By: Georgia A Staton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Michael Kehoe
Represented By: Thom K Cope
Represented By: Guadalupe Garcia
Represented By: Jana Lynn Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Michael Kirk
Represented By: Thom K Cope
Represented By: Guadalupe Garcia
Represented By: Jana Lynn Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?