Brogdon et al v. Roman Catholic Archbishop of Los Angeles et al
Plaintiff: Lauro Garcia, Unknown Parties, George Brogdon and Diana Almader-Douglas
Defendant: Roman Catholic Church Archdiocese of Los Angeles, Carlos Cocio, St John's Seminary, Archdiocese of Los Angeles, Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Tucson and Roman Catholic Archbishop of Los Angeles
Case Number: 4:2020cv00566
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Maria S Aguilera
Referring Judge: James A Soto
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Renewed) by Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Tucson. (Petersen, Andrew)
February 19, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Diana Almader-Douglas, George Brogdon, Lauro Garcia, Unknown Parties . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-2)(Pileika, Ashley)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that, on or before February 19, 2021, Plaintiffs shall file a notice of amended pleading in accordance with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 15.1(b). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to dismiss (Doc. #12 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera on 2/17/2021. (DLC)
February 16, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE re: Letter to Attorney General by George Brogdon, Lauro Garcia, Unknown Parties . (Pileika, Ashley)
February 16, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE re: Mootness by George Brogdon, Lauro Garcia, Unknown Parties re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss Case . (Pileika, Ashley)
February 16, 2021 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Roman Catholic Archbishop of Los Angeles, Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Tucson, St John's Seminary, Unknown Parties filed by Unknown Parties, Lauro Garcia, George Brogdon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 4-5)(Pileika, Ashley)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE back to Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera for all pretrial proceedings and report and recommendation in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), Fed.R.Civ.P. 72, and LRCiv 72.1, 72.2, and 72.3 of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Arizona. All future filings in this case shall be designated: CV 20-566-TUC-JAS (MSA). Signed by Judge James A Soto on 2/9/2021. (DLC)
February 5, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this Case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge James A Soto. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-20-00566-TUC-JAS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
February 5, 2021 Filing 14 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
February 2, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Tucson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Petersen, Andrew)
January 29, 2021 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by George Brogdon, Lauro Garcia: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 1/8/2021 to St. John's Seminary . (Pileika, Ashley)
January 29, 2021 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by George Brogdon, Lauro Garcia: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 1/8/2021 to The Roman Catholic Archbishop of Los Angeles a/k/a The Archdiocese of Los Angeles . (Pileika, Ashley)
January 22, 2021 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by George Brogdon, Lauro Garcia: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 01/08/2021 to The Diocese of Tucson . (Pileika, Ashley)
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 Magistrate Election Form Deadline electronically mailed (x2). (BAC)
January 4, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Ashley Pileika, David Matthew Haynie on behalf of Plaintiffs George Brogdon, Lauro Garcia, Unknown Parties. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 31, 2020 Filing 7 *Additional Attachments to Main Document -Automated Civil Coversheet re: #1 Complaint, 5 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) by Plaintiffs George Brogdon, Lauro Garcia, Unknown Parties. (Pileika, Ashley) *Modified text to clarify on 1/4/2021 (DLC).
December 31, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Carlos Cocio, Roman Catholic Church Archdiocese of Los Angeles, Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Tucson, St John's Seminary. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
December 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Lauro Garcia, George Brogdon, Unknown Parties. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: ***Please Generate the civil cover sheet document before filing. Refile corrected document by using "Additional Attachments to Main Document" event. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
December 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Lauro Garcia, George Brogdon, Unknown Parties. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
December 31, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19018776. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Maria S Aguilera. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-566-TUC-MSA. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO)
December 31, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by George Brogdon, Lauro Garcia, Unknown Parties. (Pileika, Ashley) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MCO)
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19018776 filed by Unknown Parties, Lauro Garcia, George Brogdon. (Pileika, Ashley) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brogdon et al v. Roman Catholic Archbishop of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Catholic Church Archdiocese of Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Cocio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St John's Seminary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archdiocese of Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Tucson
Represented By: Andrew James Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Catholic Archbishop of Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauro Garcia
Represented By: David Matthew Haynie
Represented By: Ashley Pileika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unknown Parties
Represented By: David Matthew Haynie
Represented By: Ashley Pileika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Brogdon
Represented By: David Matthew Haynie
Represented By: Ashley Pileika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Almader-Douglas
Represented By: David Matthew Haynie
Represented By: Ashley Pileika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?