Brightly v. Corizon Health Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Brightly
Defendant: A Ferguson, Centurion of Arizona LLC, Jillian Riley, Able Salazar, Laura Elliot, Dorothy Hines, Natalie Bell, David Shinn, Corizon Health Incorporated and Nick Salyer
Case Number: 4:2021cv00127
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Pro Se (Tucson)
Referring Judge: John C Hinderaker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Filing 28 LODGED Proposed Centurion's Response to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction re: #27 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Response to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Centurion of Arizona LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Barnes, Sarah)
May 17, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Response to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Centurion of Arizona LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnes, Sarah)
May 12, 2021 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Corizon Health Incorporated. (Fernandez, Anthony)
May 12, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand Defendant Corizon's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Request for Jury Trial by Corizon Health Incorporated.(Fernandez, Anthony)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint: Centurion of Arizona LLC answer or respond by appropriate motion by 5/24/2021. The deadlines contained in the Courts April 15, 2021 Order (Doc. #17 ), regarding briefing on the Motion for Injunctive Relief (Doc. #6 ), remain in effect. Signed by Judge John C Hinderaker on 5/7/2021. (DLC)
May 7, 2021 Filing 23 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Centurion of Arizona LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnes, Sarah)
May 7, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Lynn Barnes on behalf of Centurion of Arizona LLC. (Barnes, Sarah)
April 19, 2021 Filing 21 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Christopher Brightly: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Preliminary Injunction, Order upon Centurion Health on 4/16/21. (Scheff, Stacy)
April 19, 2021 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Corizon Health Incorporated. (SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 16, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS Submitted by Christopher Brightly. (Scheff, Stacy)
April 16, 2021 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Natalie Bell, Centurion of Arizona LLC, Laura Elliot, A Ferguson, Dorothy Hines, Nick Salyer. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER The portion of the April 12, 2021 Order (Doc. #7 ) requiring Plaintiff to complete and return service packets to the Clerk of Court and ordering service by the United States Marshal is vacated. Plaintiff must either obtain a waiver of service or serve Defendants Corizon, Centurion, Bell, Salyer, Hines, Elliott, and Ferguson with the Complaint and Summons, the April 12, 2021 Order, and this Order. Plaintiff must serve a copy of the motion for injunctive relief on Defendants Centurion, Hines, Elliott, and Ferguson. If Plaintiff does not either obtain a waiver of service of the summons or complete service of the Summons, the Complaint, the April 12, 2021 Order, and this Order on each of the above Defendants within 90 days of the filing of the Complaint or within 60 days of the filing of this Order, whichever is later, the action may be dismissed as to each Defendant not served. This matter is assigned to the standard track pursuant to Rule 16.2(b)(3) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. If properly completed, the Clerk of Court must issue the proposed Summonses filed at Docs. 10-16. Signed by Judge John C Hinderaker on 4/15/2021. (See attached Order for complete details)(DLC)
April 14, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Submitted by Christopher Brightly. (Scheff, Stacy)
April 14, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Submitted by Christopher Brightly. (Scheff, Stacy)
April 14, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Submitted by Christopher Brightly. (Scheff, Stacy)
April 14, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Submitted by Christopher Brightly. (Scheff, Stacy)
April 14, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Submitted by Christopher Brightly. (Scheff, Stacy)
April 14, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Submitted by Christopher Brightly. (Scheff, Stacy)
April 14, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Submitted by Christopher Brightly. (Scheff, Stacy)
April 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacy Estes Scheff on behalf of Christopher Brightly. (Scheff, Stacy)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Christopher Brightly. The Clerk of Court must serve by mail a copy of this Order on the Director of the Arizona Department of Corrections. Signed by Judge John C Hinderaker on 4/9/2021. (See attached Order for complete details)(DLC)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 *VACATED: The portion of this ORDER requiring Plaintiff to complete and return service packets to the Clerk of Court and ordering service by the United States Marshal is Vacated by Order doc. #17 -- ORDER (Service Packet): Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Doc. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee and is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $13.65. Plaintiff's motion to exceed the page limit for his Complaint (Doc. #5 ) is granted. Defendants Shinn, Salazar, and Riley are dismissed without prejudice. Defendants Corizon, Centurion, Bell, Salyer, Hines, Elliott, and Ferguson must answer the Complaint. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint (Doc. #1 ), this Order, the motion for injunctive relief (Doc. #6 ), and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants Corizon, Centurion, Bell, Salyer, Hines, Elliott, and Ferguson. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. The United States Marshal must retain the Summons, a copy of the Complaint, a copy of the motion for injunctive relief (Doc. #6 ), and a copy of this Order for future use. Defendants Centurion, Hines, Elliott, and Ferguson must respond to Plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief (Doc. #6 ), no later than 30 days following the return of a waiver of service or service of the Complaint, summons, and motion on them. Signed by Judge John C Hinderaker on 4/9/2021. (See attached Order for complete details)(DLC) Modified on 4/15/2021 (DLC).
March 24, 2021 Filing 6 EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Christopher Brightly. (47 pages) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(JAM)
March 24, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT #1 by Christopher Brightly. (2 pages) (JAM)
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (JAM)
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Christopher Brightly. (3 pages) (JAM)
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Christopher Brightly. (2 pages) (JAM)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Christopher Brightly. (26 pages) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brightly v. Corizon Health Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion of Arizona LLC
Represented By: Sarah Lynn Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jillian Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Able Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Elliot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Bell
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Fernandez
Represented By: Alyssa Rae Illsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Shinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health Incorporated
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Fernandez
Represented By: Alyssa Rae Illsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Salyer
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Fernandez
Represented By: Alyssa Rae Illsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Brightly
Represented By: Stacy Estes Scheff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?