Lindsey v. 1725 A AVE LLC et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Lindsey
Defendant: Extended Stay Douglas LLC, John D Quense, 1725 A AVE LLC and Christina M Quense
Case Number: 4:2021cv00161
Filed: April 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: David C Bury
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Filing 6 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1725 A AVE LLC. (Shields, James) *Modified to reflect correct filers and correct docket text on 6/2/2021 (ARC).
June 1, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by 1725 A AVE LLC, Christina M Quense, John D Quense.(Shields, James)
April 19, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Peter Joseph Bober on behalf of Plaintiff Amanda Lindsey. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 13, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to 1725 A AVE LLC, Extended Stay Douglas LLC, Christina M Quense, John D Quense. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 12, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19351253. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David C Bury. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-161-TUC-DCB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
April 12, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Amanda Lindsey. (Turchik, Merle) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(ARC)
April 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19351253 filed by Amanda Lindsey. (Turchik, Merle) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindsey v. 1725 A AVE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extended Stay Douglas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D Quense
Represented By: Paige Constance Pataky
Represented By: James Burr Shields, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1725 A AVE LLC
Represented By: Paige Constance Pataky
Represented By: James Burr Shields, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina M Quense
Represented By: Paige Constance Pataky
Represented By: James Burr Shields, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Lindsey
Represented By: Peter Bober
Represented By: Merle Joy Turchik
Represented By: Peter Joseph Bober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?