Fawcett v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Albert Raymond Fawcett
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2021cv00197
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Raner C Collins
Referring Judge: Jacqueline M Rateau
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau for all pretrial proceedings and Report and Recommendation, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, and 72.2. All future filings in this case shall be designated: CV-24-00197-TUC-RCC (JR). Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 6/28/2021. (DLC)
June 28, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this Case is reassigned by random draw to Senior District Judge Raner C Collins. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-21-00197-TUC-RCC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
June 26, 2021 Filing 15 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
June 26, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christopher Bella appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Correcting Document #12. (Bella, Christopher)
June 26, 2021 Filing 12 *NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christopher Bella appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Bella, Christopher) *Document filed in error, correct document filed at doc. #13 on 6/28/2021 (DLC).
June 4, 2021 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Albert Raymond Fawcett: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Attorney General. SSA General Counsel, Civil Process Clerk on 5/25/21. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Perales, Monica)
June 2, 2021 NOTICE of request for e-notices by Michael A. Ambri. (Ambri, Michael)
May 28, 2021 Filing 10 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
May 20, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Monica Perales on behalf of Plaintiff Albert Raymond Fawcett. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 18, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (DLC)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff may proceed without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefor. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau on 5/17/2021. (DLC)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to LRCiv 16.2(b)(1)(B), the Court issues this Scheduling Order without holding a scheduling conference. IT IS ORDERED that the parties must fully comply with the following deadlines and procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau on 5/15/2021. (See attached Order for complete details)(DLC)
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Albert Raymond Fawcett. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAM)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jacqueline M Rateau. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-197-TUC-JR. Magistrate Election form attached. (JAM)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Albert Raymond Fawcett. (Perales, Monica) (JAM)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Albert Raymond Fawcett. (Perales, Monica) (JAM)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Albert Raymond Fawcett. (Perales, Monica) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fawcett v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Raymond Fawcett
Represented By: Monica Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Christopher James Bella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?