Negron v. Carrillo et al
Plaintiff: Stephan Negron
Defendant: Victor Manuel Carrillo, USA Auto Incorporated, Red Mountain Funding Incorporated and Briselda Hernandez
Case Number: 4:2021cv00285
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Soto
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 32710
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Filing 21 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Victor Manuel Carrillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Updated Order to Extend Time to Answer)(Frisch, James)
September 17, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Victor Manuel Carrillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order to Extend Time to Answer)(Frisch, James)
September 17, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by James Charles Frisch on behalf of Victor Manuel Carrillo. (Frisch, James)
September 17, 2021 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USA Auto Incorporated. (Onuschak, David)
September 15, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Red Mountain Funding Incorporated. (Fish, Trevor)
September 15, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Red Mountain Funding Incorporated.(Fish, Trevor)
September 15, 2021 Filing 15 USA AUTO, INC.'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint by USA Auto Incorporated.(Onuschak, David)
September 13, 2021 Filing 14 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Briselda Hernandez. (MYE)
September 10, 2021 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Stephan Negron against Defendant Briselda Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Bybee, Floyd)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED GRANTING the parties' Stipulation for Extension of Time (Doc. #11 ). The deadline for Defendant USA Auto, Inc. to file its Answer or other Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended up to and including September 15, 2021. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 8/31/21. (MYE)
August 31, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint First Request by USA Auto Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McCarthy, Ryan)
August 9, 2021 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Stephan Negron: Declaration of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Victor Manuel Carrillo on 08/07/2021. (Bybee, Floyd)
August 6, 2021 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Stephan Negron: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Briselda Hernandez on 08/02/2021. (Bybee, Floyd)
August 6, 2021 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Stephan Negron: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Red Mountain Funding Inc. on 07/28/2021. (Bybee, Floyd)
August 6, 2021 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Stephan Negron: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon USA Auto Inc. on 07/26/2021. (Bybee, Floyd)
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE re: Service of Initial Order by Stephan Negron re: #5 Order . (Bybee, Floyd)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re: Communication with the Court, Dispositive Motions, Proposed Orders, Paper Copies, Exhibits, Authority Binders, and Emailing Documents. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 7/21/2021. (See Order for complete details)(ARC)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Victor Manuel Carrillo, Briselda Hernandez, Red Mountain Funding Incorporated, USA Auto Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(REM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19681596. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A. Soto. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-00285-TUC-JAS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REM)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Stephan Negron.(Bybee, Floyd) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(REM)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19681596 filed by Stephan Negron.(Bybee, Floyd) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - L, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(REM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Negron v. Carrillo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephan Negron
Represented By: Floyd W Bybee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Manuel Carrillo
Represented By: James Charles Frisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Auto Incorporated
Represented By: David Craig Onuschak, II
Represented By: Ryan John McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Mountain Funding Incorporated
Represented By: Trevor Joseph Fish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briselda Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?