Proctor v. Riley Industrial Services Incorporated
Plaintiff: David Proctor
Defendant: Riley Industrial Services Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2021cv00306
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Jennifer G Zipps
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 4 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by David Proctor: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 08/20/2021 to Riley Industrial Services, Inc. . (Carden, Joshua)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES: THE PARTIES ARE ADVISED that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. In addition, parties shall endeavor not to oppose motions to amend that are filed prior to the Scheduling Conference or within the time set forth in the Rule 16 Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 8/2/2021. (See attached Order for complete details)(DLC)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19721423. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jennifer G Zipps. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-306-TUC-JGZ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19721423 filed by David Proctor. (Carden, Joshua) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Proctor v. Riley Industrial Services Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Proctor
Represented By: Joshua William Carden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Industrial Services Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?